This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:28:03 (UTC).

OKSANA PEKARKY VS 404 N MAPLE DRIVE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/01/2016 OKSANA PEKARKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 404 N MAPLE DRIVE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2096

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PEKARKY OKSANA

Defendants and Respondents

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

404 N. MAPLE DRIVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FIORE MAURO JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/11/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

9/1/2016: Summons

Complaint

9/1/2016: Complaint

CoverSheet

9/1/2016: CoverSheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Oksana Pekarky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Oksana Pekarky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Oksana Pekarky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Oksana Pekarky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Oksana Pekarky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant