This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 20:37:33 (UTC).

O.K., LLC VS. YORAN ELIYA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2015 O K , LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YORAN ELIYA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3261

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O.K. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1ST POINT LENDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ABEKASIS ARIE

ELIYA YORAN AKA YARON ELIYA AKA YARONE ELIYA AKA YARON ZLIYA

MELKA MARCELLE AKA MARCELLE OHNONA AKA MARCELLA MELKA

DIDITAN FINANCIAL INC. A CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY DESCRIBED AS 3314 BARHAM BLVD. LOS ANGELES CA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBLATT FREDRIC JAY

Defendant Attorney

SMITH ROBERT FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/10/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

8/10/2015: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/20/2015: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/21/2015: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/27/2015: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Legacy Document

10/1/2015: Legacy Document

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/6/2015: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/8/2015: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document

10/15/2015: Legacy Document

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

10/27/2015: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Legacy Document

12/18/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

12/18/2015: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

12/18/2015: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/18/2015: Notice of Lis Pendens

Legacy Document

12/21/2015: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

12/28/2015: Legacy Document

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (To Attrorneys - Leslie Richards, Law Offices of Leslie Richards, AFC); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketMotion to Quash; Filed by Diditan Financial, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by O.K., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); 1st Point Lending, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less