This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2021 at 20:47:37 (UTC).

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION VS. ISSACHAR SHABTAY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISSACHAR SHABTAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4641

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Trustees

FISHMAN YORAM

LEVY URIEL

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION

LEVY URIEL INDIVIDUALLY

ELIAS ALON

CONGREGATION OHR GEDALYAHU

Defendant

SHABTAY ISSACHAR

Cross Plaintiffs

YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI 501C3 FOR YOSEFF

CHAIM YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI

YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI CHAIM

YOSEFF CHAIM TEMPLE

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION

ANCONINA YEHUDA

GLADYS TROESDEN

ELIAS ALON

ANCONINA YEHUDA AS MANAGER OHR GEDALUAHU

TROESDEN GLADYS

YAHIEL LEVY AKA YACHIEL LEVY

SAMUEL NURIEL AKA SHMUEL NURIEL

OHANA SAMUEL

REID ROBYN

SALGADO RUDOLFO GARCIA

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CROCKETT WILLIAM EDWIN

LEVITT SOL

WILLIAM E. CROCKETT LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

EANET PC

SLAUGHTER REAGAN & COLE LLP

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KIRAKOSIAN & ASSOCIATES

PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

Other Attorneys

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET WITTBRODT

TWANI L. TAKAGI LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL MINUTE ORDER OF 03/06/19 ADDRESSED TO LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. CROCKETT

3/13/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL MINUTE ORDER OF 03/06/19 ADDRESSED TO LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. CROCKETT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE MABEL HAYEK, CSR 11815

6/28/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE MABEL HAYEK, CSR 11815

Notice of Appearance

6/28/2019: Notice of Appearance

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

7/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/08/2019

7/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) OF 07/08/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Other - - RETURN MAIL AS TO: LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. CROCKETT 21031 VENTURA BLVD. SUITE 401 WOODLAND HILLS, CA 91364

7/18/2019: Other - - RETURN MAIL AS TO: LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E. CROCKETT 21031 VENTURA BLVD. SUITE 401 WOODLAND HILLS, CA 91364

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED ON BEHA...)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED ON BEHA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED ON BEHA...) OF 09/13/2019

9/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED ON BEHA...) OF 09/13/2019

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AND HEARINGS

10/15/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AND HEARINGS

Status Report

10/21/2019: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; 2)STATUS CONFERENCE RE: "ECCLESIAST...)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; 2)STATUS CONFERENCE RE: "ECCLESIAST...)

Order - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE, MABEL HAYEK CSR NO.11815 FOR 10/23/2019 HEARING IN DEPARTMENT D

10/23/2019: Order - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE, MABEL HAYEK CSR NO.11815 FOR 10/23/2019 HEARING IN DEPARTMENT D

Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AND CONTINUED HEARINGS

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AND CONTINUED HEARINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY ONLY IN RELATED...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY ONLY IN RELATED...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY ONLY IN RELATED...) OF 01/23/2020

1/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY ONLY IN RELATED...) OF 01/23/2020

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Answer of Defendant Issachar Shabtay Should Not Be Stricken) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Cross-Complaint filed by Defendant Issachar Shabtay) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Cross-Complaint filed by...) of 04/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Cross-Complaint filed by...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Cross-Complaint filed by Defendant Issachar Shabtay) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketBrief (in Support of Order to Show Cause); Filed by YORAM FISHMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by YORAM FISHMAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
451 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-12-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2014
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal (COUNSEL - CIVIL; ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2014
  • DocketOrder for Withdrawal; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less