This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 04:20:04 (UTC).

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION VS. ISSACHAR SHABTAY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ISSACHAR SHABTAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN and RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4641

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Trustees

FISHMAN YORAM

LEVY URIEL

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION

LEVY URIEL INDIVIDUALLY

ELIAS ALON

CONGREGATION OHR GEDALYAHU

Defendant

SHABTAY ISSACHAR

Cross Plaintiffs

YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI 501C3 FOR YOSEFF

CHAIM YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI

YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI CHAIM

YOSEFF CHAIM TEMPLE

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

OHR GEDALYAHU CONGREGATION

ANCONINA YEHUDA

GLADYS TROESDEN

ELIAS ALON

ANCONINA YEHUDA AS MANAGER OHR GEDALUAHU

TROESDEN GLADYS

YAHIEL LEVY AKA YACHIEL LEVY

SAMUEL NURIEL AKA SHMUEL NURIEL

OHANA SAMUEL

REID ROBYN

SALGADO RUDOLFO GARCIA

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KENNETH C. BOUNDS

WILLIAM E. CROCKETT

CROCKETT WILLIAM EDWIN

WILLIAM E. CROCKETT LAW OFFICES OF

LEVITT SOL

Defendant Attorneys

JODY STEINBERG

SLAUGHTER REAGAN & COLE LLP

EANET PC

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIRAKOSIAN & ASSOCIATES

Other Attorneys

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET WITTBRODT

TWANI L. TAKAGI LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/2/2015: Minute Order

Legacy Document

2/9/2016: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

4/4/2016: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

4/13/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/25/2016: Legacy Document

Request for Judicial Notice

4/28/2016: Request for Judicial Notice

Other -

5/6/2016: Other -

Legacy Document

5/19/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

7/18/2016: Legacy Document

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2016: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Legacy Document

9/14/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

10/28/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

5/25/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/1/2018: Legacy Document

Order

3/8/2019: Order

Request for Judicial Notice

4/16/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

4/19/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

207 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (filed on behalf of Defendant Issac har Shabtay) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • at 8:53 PM in Department D; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Mabel Hayek, CSR 11815); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed on beha...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Status Report; Filed by ISSACHAR SHABTAY for YOSEFF CHAIM (Cross-Complainant); SHABTAY, ISSACHAR ON BEHALF OF (Cross-Complainant); YOSEFF BEN EISH CHI 501C3 FOR YOSEFF (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Status Report; Filed by SHABTAY, ISSACHAR ON BEHALF OF (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by SHABTAY, ISSACHAR ON BEHALF OF (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
385 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • at 1:30 PM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2014
  • Order for Withdrawal; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2014
  • Order for Withdrawal (COUNSEL - CIVIL; ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.