This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 04:27:06 (UTC).

ODETA ZOGRABYAN VS VANNA TAMAR KITSINIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2011 ODETA ZOGRABYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VANNA TAMAR KITSINIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, RANDY RHODES, GAIL FEUER, ADR NEUTRAL, DAVID S. MILTON, DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN, MASTER CALENDAR, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, LAURA A. MATZ, JOHN P. DOYLE and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7043

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

RANDY RHODES

GAIL FEUER

ADR NEUTRAL

DAVID S. MILTON

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

MASTER CALENDAR

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

LAURA A. MATZ

JOHN P. DOYLE

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ZOGRABYAN ODETA

KOCHARYAN RUZANNA

KOCHARYAN TIGRAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DER

KITSINIAN VANNA TAMAR

DER-OHANESSIAN SATIG

Not Classified By Court

BURKE HON. YVONNE B. ESQ.

Others

GIRARDI & KEESE

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALANTARIAN ART

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

CALENDO PUCKETT SHEEDY & DICORRADO

GRAY YORK DUFFY LAW OFFICES OF

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

GRAY DUFFY LLP

GRAY * DUFFY LLP

CALENDO PUCKETT SHEEDY LLP

DOHERTY & CATLOW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GRAY DUFFY LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JACK M. LIEBHABER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/11/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JACK M. LIEBHABER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FSC DATES

9/16/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FSC DATES

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE UPON MARCEL PONTON, PH.D.

2/11/2014: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE UPON MARCEL PONTON, PH.D.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL ? CIVIL

2/18/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL ? CIVIL

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ? CIVIL

2/18/2014: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ? CIVIL

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ? CIVIL

2/18/2014: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ? CIVIL

Minute Order

3/7/2014: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN QPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REOPEN IMSCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED LURPOSE OF COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ?DETA ZOGRABIAN TO UNDERGO NEURO-

3/12/2014: PLAINTIFF?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN QPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REOPEN IMSCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED LURPOSE OF COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ?DETA ZOGRABIAN TO UNDERGO NEURO-

DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR LEAVE TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ODETA ZOGRABYAN TO UNDERGO MARCH 20, 2014 NEURO-PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION WI

3/12/2014: DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR LEAVE TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF COMPELLING PLAINTIFF ODETA ZOGRABYAN TO UNDERGO MARCH 20, 2014 NEURO-PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION WI

NOTICE OF ORDER FOR BIFURCATION

3/21/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER FOR BIFURCATION

Minute Order

5/12/2014: Minute Order

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO PRECLUDE ART KALANTARIAN, ESQ. AND ROBERT FINNERTY, ESQ. FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING THE REASONABLENESS OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN ODETA ZOGRABYAN AND DEFENDANTS VANNA TAMAR KITSIN

6/11/2014: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO PRECLUDE ART KALANTARIAN, ESQ. AND ROBERT FINNERTY, ESQ. FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING THE REASONABLENESS OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN ODETA ZOGRABYAN AND DEFENDANTS VANNA TAMAR KITSIN

PROPOSED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

6/17/2014: PROPOSED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

Minute Order

6/27/2014: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HEAR MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT; ETC.

7/18/2014: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HEAR MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT; ETC.

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SED ASIDE JUDGMENT; ETC.

7/18/2014: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SED ASIDE JUDGMENT; ETC.

NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S DPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S 4MENDED MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTIONS 664.6 AND 998

9/18/2014: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S DPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S 4MENDED MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE THE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTIONS 664.6 AND 998

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 24,2014)

9/24/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR SEPTEMBER 24,2014)

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice (OF COURT'S SIGNED ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUANCE THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND TRIAL DATE; DECLARATIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Order (CONTINUING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (DIANA L. SOLIS, CSR#9715 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Separate Statement Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Opposition Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Objection (TO OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Separate Statement (OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Notice (OF LODGING DEPOSITION ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2011
  • Notice (OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE PURSUANT TO CCP170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Notice (of court's acceptance of peremptory challenge to Judicial officer pursuant to CCP 170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Notice (OF COURT'S ACCEPTANCE OF PEREMPTOR CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURSUANT TO CCP170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • Notice (of filing of peremptory challenge to Judicial Officer pursuant to CCP 170.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (personal svc on 10-13-11 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Affidavit of Prejudice-Peremptory Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Notice (of OSC re trial court delay reduction act ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES — CENTRAL DISTRICT

ODETA ZOGRABYAN, Case No.: EC 057043 (Related to

EC057340)

Plaintiffs Complaint Filed: October 7, 2011

udge: Samantha P. Jessner | ept. 93 '

H JUDGMENT ON OMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF ODETA

VANNA TAMAR KITSINIAN; SATIG DER- OHANESSIAN; DOES 1-25,

Defendants. OGRABYAN o [Filed concurrently with a fully executed Offer AND ALL RELATED ACTIONS o Compromise, CCP 998]

Pursuant to a fully executed Offer to Compromise under California Code of Civil | Procedure §998 between Plaintiff Odeta Zograbyan and Defendant Vanna Tamar Kitsinian, filed concurrently with this [proposed] judgment,

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED, as follows:

That judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff ODETA ZOGRABYAN and against

| Defendant VANNA TAMAR KITSINIAN in the amount of $147,000.00. The total judgment of

ot —_

Judge of the Superior Court

1$147,000 includes all fees and costs.

tDated: May 42014