This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2016 at 13:47:28 (UTC).

OCTAVIO GONZALEZ VS. RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2011 OCTAVIO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4503

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ OCTAVIO

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

DR. MEHRAN TABAN

DR. RON P. GALLEMORE

RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAURO FIORE JR.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2012
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Request for Dismissal ( ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Statement Of The Case Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Jury Instructions ( PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Witness List Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Exhibit List Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • Notice (OF ERRATA REGARDING COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default ( AGAINST RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE -SET ASIDE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default ( AGAINST DR. MEHRAN TABAN -SET ASIDE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default ( AGAINST DR. RON P. GALLEMORE -SET ASIDE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: DR. MEHRAN TABAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: DR. RON P. GALLEMORE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Retina Macula Institute is a litigant