This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2019 at 00:55:50 (UTC).

NUNE KOTCHOLOSIAN, ET AL VS. AVINA GENERAL CONTRACTORS,ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2012 NUNE KOTCHOLOSIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AVINA GENERAL CONTRACTORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL FEUER, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, HALM, HOWARD L., SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, LAURA A. MATZ and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8951

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GAIL FEUER

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

HALM, HOWARD L.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

LAURA A. MATZ

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KOTCHOLOSIAN NUNE

TEVANIAN TEVAN

THE MANAGEMENT EMPORIUM

REGENCY COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

JAY SCHELLEN

SCHELLEN JAY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AVINA GENERAL CONTRACTORS

AVINA MR.

GEVONDIAN HARUTUIN

MARTIN AVINA INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TONY FORBERG

VICTOR JACOBOVITZ

JACOBOVITZ VICTOR

FORBERG TONY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LIBERTYBELL LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS COMPLAINT

10/27/2015: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/22/2015: Minute Order

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTIONIDISCOVERY DATES3 PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

2/10/2014: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC [AND RELATED MOTIONIDISCOVERY DATES3 PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, AND ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MARTIN AVINA IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,000.00 PURSUANT TO C.C.P 664.6, DECLARATION OF TONY FORBERG, AND

12/29/2014: PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, AND ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MARTIN AVINA IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,000.00 PURSUANT TO C.C.P 664.6, DECLARATION OF TONY FORBERG, AND

Minute Order

9/15/2015: Minute Order

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

9/4/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order

10/1/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/10/2014: Minute Order

APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

4/6/2015: APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

Minute Order

10/26/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2014: Minute Order

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND ETC

7/16/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND ETC

Minute Order

7/9/2014: Minute Order

EFENDA4T?S EXHIRFI? LJST

2/10/2014: EFENDA4T?S EXHIRFI? LJST

JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

12/29/2014: JUDGMENT BY COURT ON STIPULATION

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/11/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

5/5/2014: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93)

FFFNDANT?S WITNESS LIST

2/10/2014: FFFNDANT?S WITNESS LIST

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2015
  • Notice (of dismissal of deft/x-comp. cross-complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Nune Kotcholosian (Legacy Party); Tevan Tevanian (Plaintiff); Harutuin Gevondian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Osc Re Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department LA93, Halm, Howard L., Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL PER SETTLEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Nune Kotcholosian (Legacy Party); Tevan Tevanian (Plaintiff); Harutuin Gevondian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Osc Re Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Nune Kotcholosian (Legacy Party); Tevan Tevanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • at 3:30 PM in Department E; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • at 03:30 pm in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Nune Kotcholosian (Legacy Party); Tevan Tevanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.