This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 00:05:31 (UTC).

NU REMEDY HEALTH CARE ET AL VS CITY OF PASADENA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 NU REMEDY HEALTH CARE filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6861

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NU REMEDY HEALTH CARE

BOGGS JESSE

GREEN LOTUS ENTERTAINMENT

HOHMAN CHARLES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF PASADENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMEL STAJNLEY H.

Defendant Attorneys

COLANTUONO MICHAEL GEORGE

BAGNERIS MICHELE BEAL

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DAMLE NIKHIL S.

 

Court Documents

Notice

5/3/2019: Notice

Unknown

5/15/2019: Unknown

Notice

5/17/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/16/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLAINT FILED: JANUARY 12. 2016

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLAINT FILED: JANUARY 12. 2016

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED

5/14/2018: NOTICE STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED

CITY OF PASADENA'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

8/28/2018: CITY OF PASADENA'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/2/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Rescheduling of Case Management Conference); Filed by City of Pasadena (Defendant); People Of The State Of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by City of Pasadena (Defendant); People Of The State Of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Pasadena City Ordinance Should Not Be Applicable) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Status Conference (re Why Pasadena City Ordinance Should Not Be Applicable) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CCP 1209) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for an Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt (CCP 1209) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by City of Pasadena (Defendant); People Of The State Of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-03-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nu Remedy Health Care (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE S & C ON CITY OF PASADENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nu Remedy Health Care (Plaintiff); Jesse Boggs (Plaintiff); Green Lotus Entertainment (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF CC 52.1; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less