This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 17:50:16 (UTC).

NOVARRO C STAFFORD M D VS ATTENDING STAFF ASSOC FOR THE LOS

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 NOVARRO C STAFFORD M D filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ATTENDING STAFF ASSOC FOR THE LOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0519

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STAFFORD NOVARRO C. M.D.

Defendant and Respondent

ATTENDING STAFF ASSOCIATION FOR THE LOS

Interested Parties

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

LOS ANGELES COUNTY CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEVEN TROLARD & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HARWELL JOHN D.

Interested Party Attorney

WEISS DAVID J. LAW OFFICES

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT GRANTING WRIT OF MANDAMUS

12/1/2017: JUDGMENT GRANTING WRIT OF MANDAMUS

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

12/18/2017: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

NOTICE OF APPEAL

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order

5/3/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AS AGAINST THE COUNTY

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO STRIKE PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AS AGAINST THE COUNTY

PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/19/2016: PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PETITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN F. GOLDING

4/7/2016: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PETITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JONATHAN F. GOLDING

REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' DEMURRER TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR ETC.

4/22/2016: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' DEMURRER TO PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,297.90 AGAINST PLAINTIFF NOVARRO C. STAFFORD, M.D. AND HIS COUNSEL STEVEN TROLARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATI

6/28/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,297.90 AGAINST PLAINTIFF NOVARRO C. STAFFORD, M.D. AND HIS COUNSEL STEVEN TROLARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATI

DECLARATION OF STEVEN TROLARD IN OPPOSITION TO ANTI-SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

7/8/2016: DECLARATION OF STEVEN TROLARD IN OPPOSITION TO ANTI-SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

RESPONDENT'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ANTI-SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

7/14/2016: RESPONDENT'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ANTI-SLAPP SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

10/18/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/29/2016: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

PETITIONER'S OPENING TRIAL BRIEF

8/2/2017: PETITIONER'S OPENING TRIAL BRIEF

REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' TRIAL BRIEF

9/1/2017: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' TRIAL BRIEF

RESPONDENT ATTENDING STAFF ASSOCIATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT

9/1/2017: RESPONDENT ATTENDING STAFF ASSOCIATION'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT

Minute Order

12/1/2017: Minute Order

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • at 09:31 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • STIPULATION FOR ORDER AND ORDER STAYING HEARING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PENDTNG RESOLUTION OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • RESPONDENT ATTENDING STAFF ASSOCIATION OF LAC+USC MEDICAL CENTER'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • REAL PARTY IN INTEREST COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO FIX AMOUNT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • at 09:31 AM in Department 82; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (Motion for Attorney Fees; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • PETITIONER'S OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Attending Staff Association for the Los (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (CCP SECTION 1085, 1086, 1102, 1103); OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A RULING DECLARING PETITIONER IS NOT REQUIRED TO EXHAUST THE PEER REVIEW PROCESS BEFORE RESORTING TO COURT ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS160519    Hearing Date: September 15, 2020    Dept: 82

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARWELL JOHN D.