This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2016 03:02:04

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 a Property - Other Property Fraud case was filed by Norman Zada against Rebecca Chaney in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX8099
  • Filing Date 05/07/2013
  • Case Status Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type Property - Other Property Fraud
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Zada Norman
  • Represented By
    • Lynell D. Davis Esq.
    • Natalie Locke Esq.
    • Krause Kalfayan Benink & Slavens Llp
  • Defendant Chaney Rebecca
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Defendant Chaney Rebekah
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Defendant Does 1 Through 20
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Defendant Herzfeld John
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Defendant Seraphim Films Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Defendant Seraphim Films Productions Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Spillane Trial Group Plc
    • Doland & Fraade
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
  • Respondent Does 1 Through 20
  • Represented By
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
    • Doland & Fraade
  • Cross Defendant Zada Norman
  • Represented By
    • Krause Kalfayan Benink & Slavens Llp
    • Lynell D. Davis Esq.
  • Respondent Chaney Rebecca
  • Represented By
    • Law Office Of James A. Bryant
    • Doland & Fraade

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

10/8/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Fees Apply
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RE...

1/9/2015: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ...

Fees Apply
Proof of Service

9/30/2013: Proof of Service

Fees Apply
OTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT?S EX PAR...

10/17/2014: OTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS? AND CROSSCOMPLAIN...

Fees Apply
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

5/10/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF ...

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

8/22/2013: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF NATALIE LOCKE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF...

1/23/2014: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF NATALIE LOCKE ON BEHALF O...

Fees Apply
Minute Order

12/2/2014: Minute Order

Fees Apply
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT...

1/9/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF...

Fees Apply
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION...

1/15/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITIO...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF JOHN HERZFELD IN SUPOORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN HE...

1/9/2015: DECLARATION OF JOHN HERZFELD IN SUPOORT OF DEFENDA...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 02/18/2015
  • Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF NORMAN ZADA'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL TO SET FOR HEARING ON FEBRUARY 25, 2015 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/29/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (AMENDED PROOF OF DELIVERY ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
  • 01/28/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF DELIVERY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/22/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/22/2015
  • Reply to Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JOHN HERZFELD "FILED BY FAX" ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/22/2015
  • Notice (REGARDING THE JANUARY 21, 2015 HEARING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR THE PRODUCTION OF RECORDS FROM BRUCE A. HERSH, C.P.A, AN ACCOUNTANCY) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/22/2015
  • Supplemental Declaration (OF LYNELL D. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSIITON OF DEFENDANT JOHN HERZFELD "FILED BY FAX" ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 01/15/2015
  • Opposition Document (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOHN HERZFELD ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
  • 01/13/2015
  • Proof of Service ("BY FAX" ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request (FOR LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT "BY FAX" ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl
  • 01/12/2015
  • Proof of Service (amended proof of service of docs re plaintiff Zada's Mtns to Compel responses to requests for the production of documents to defts & for monetary sanctions ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Motion to Compel (further responses to plaintiff Zada's second set of requests for the production of docs to deft Seraphim Films Productions, Inc.; monetary sanctions ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Motion to Compel (further responses to plaintiff Norman Zada's 3rd set or requests for the production of documents to deft Rebecca Chaney requests nos. 43, 45-50, 52-60, 63-72; request for sanctions) Filed by Attorney for Defendant & X-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Motion to Compel (further responses to pltff Zada's 2nd set of requests for the production of docs to deft John Herzfeld [req. nos. 48-51, 56-59, 61-70] req for sanctions ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Motion to Compel (further responses to pltff Zada's 3rd set of requests for the production of documents to deft Seraphim Films, Inc. ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Proof of Service (of docs re pltff Zada's Mtns to Compel responses to requests for the production of docs to defts and for monetary sanctions ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (separate statement in support of mtn to compel responses to pltff Zada's 2nd set of requrest for the production of docs to deft Seraphim Films Productions, Inc. and for monetary sanctions) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (separate statement in support of mtn to compel further response to pltff Zada's 3rd set of requests for the production of documents to deft Rebecca Chaney ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
  • 01/09/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (separate statement in support of mtn to compel responses to pltff Zada's 2nd set of requests for the production of documents to deft John Herzfeld & for monetary sanctions) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.