This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 01:08:42 (UTC).

NORMA MCPHOY VS LUIS ANTONIO MENDEZ RAMIREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2016 NORMA MCPHOY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS ANTONIO MENDEZ RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8805

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCPHOY NORMA

Defendants and Respondents

TORRES JORGE

RAMIREZ LUIS ANTONIO MENDEZ

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

PRM INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ETEHAD SIMON P. ESQ.

UPTON JOHN MICHAEL

DORDICK GARY A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

SOZIO MICHAELA L. ESQ.

TSENG JENNIFER T. ESQ.

TRESSLER LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL OTHER DATES; DECLARATION OF JOHN M. UPTON, ESQ., IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBITS

12/29/2017: STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL OTHER DATES; DECLARATION OF JOHN M. UPTON, ESQ., IN SUPPORT THEREOF; EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

1/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MOTION IS GRANTED

2/27/2018: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MOTION IS GRANTED

Minute Order

2/27/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/7/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/26/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF PAULA HUCHIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/17/2018: DECLARATION OF PAULA HUCHIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Motion in Limine

12/10/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

12/10/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

12/10/2018: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

12/10/2018: Motion in Limine

Notice

2/4/2019: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND STATUTORY LIABILITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/29/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND STATUTORY LIABILITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS

7/29/2016: SUMMONS

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Ruling); Filed by Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Date, and the Deadline to Complete Expert Witness Depositions); Filed by Norma Mcphoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Fina...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Date, and the Deadline to Complete Expert Witness Depositions); Filed by Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial Date); Filed by Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Norma Mcphoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Norma Mcphoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENCE AND STATUTORY LIABILITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC628805    Hearing Date: January 27, 2020    Dept: I

Norma McPhoy v. Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez

BC628805

Tentative Decision on Defendant’s Motion to Tax Costs

Defendant, Luis Antonio Mendez Ramirez (“Ramirez”), seeks to tax all of the costs sought by the prevailing party in this matter, the plaintiff, Norma McPhoy totaling $24,397. The only stated ground of objection as to all categories of costs is the fact that the plaintiff did not attach invoices for the claimed costs to her Memorandum of Costs. However, as plaintiff points out in her Opposition, the Memorandum of Costs by itself is premia facie evidence of the reasonableness of the costs. No invoices are required by statute to be attached to the Memorandum. Moreover, plaintiff amended to her request in her Opposition to reduce the total claim to $21,289.31.

Plaintiff has submitted invoices for all of the claimed costs. The Court has reviewed all of the invoices and, with one exception, finds that they were reasonable and necessary costs in this lawsuit. The one exception if the claim for transcripts of court proceedings. The plaintiff included invoices totaling $1,599 for court proceeding transcripts. However, such costs are recoverable only if ordered by the Court. [C.C.P. sec. 1033.5(b)(5).] The Court entered no such order in this matter and plaintiff has cited no such order. Accordingly, the Court will tax costs of the plaintiff in the amount of $1,599. The Clerk will amend the judgment in this matter to award plaintiff costs in the amount of $19,690.31.