This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:08:43 (UTC).

NOCQULA JONES VS. RICKY DARNELL BRIDGES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 NOCQULA JONES filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICKY DARNELL BRIDGES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8611

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES NOCQULA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

BRIDGES RICKY DARNELL

DOES 1-20

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DYGERT KENLEY

THERESA ANN JONES

Defendant Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS J. III

TULLIUS JENNIFER RAE

MCKINNEY DALE

 

Court Documents

Brief

7/12/2018: Brief

Brief

7/12/2018: Brief

Other -

7/19/2018: Other -

Declaration

8/3/2018: Declaration

Unknown

9/12/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

9/19/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

10/1/2018: Notice of Related Case

Unknown

10/12/2018: Unknown

Motion for Attorney Fees

10/16/2018: Motion for Attorney Fees

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/16/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration

10/16/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Order

11/28/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

12/19/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

3/6/2019: Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

3/6/2019: Abstract of Judgment?Civil and Small Claims

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: 170.6 CCP Reassignment with Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B292423.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Order For Attorney Fees & Costs; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2016
  • Notice; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Application is granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Order; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by NOCQULA JONES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less