This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 13:35:03 (UTC).

NICOLE BAUTISTA ET AL VS MUSCLEWOOD INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2015 NICOLE BAUTISTA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MUSCLEWOOD INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7411

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BAUTISTA NICOLE

RUIZ OSCAR

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

LOPEZ EDWARD

MUSCLEWOOD INVESTMENT PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARBOSA PATRICIA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

LEINEWEBER CECILIA K.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/3/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Unknown

2/8/2016: Unknown

DECLARATION OF AYMAN MOURAD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

2/24/2016: DECLARATION OF AYMAN MOURAD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

2/25/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

2/25/2016: Unknown

PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO DENY DEFENDANTS' LATE REPLY ISO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULES

5/23/2016: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO DENY DEFENDANTS' LATE REPLY ISO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULES

Unknown

6/6/2016: Unknown

Unknown

6/6/2016: Unknown

DEFENDANTS MUSCLE WOOD PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC AND EDWARD LOPEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/21/2016: DEFENDANTS MUSCLE WOOD PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC AND EDWARD LOPEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DECLARATION OF PATRICIA BARBOSA ISO NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING ON JULY 26, 2016

6/27/2016: DECLARATION OF PATRICIA BARBOSA ISO NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING ON JULY 26, 2016

PLAINTIFFS NICOLE BAUTISTA AND OSCAR RUIZ'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/12/2016: PLAINTIFFS NICOLE BAUTISTA AND OSCAR RUIZ'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR OSCAR RUIZ'S MEDICAL RECORDS, VETERINARY RECORDS, AND RECORDS FROM GUIDE DOGS OF AMERICA

9/12/2016: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR OSCAR RUIZ'S MEDICAL RECORDS, VETERINARY RECORDS, AND RECORDS FROM GUIDE DOGS OF AMERICA

RULING

9/13/2016: RULING

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

9/13/2016: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

9/27/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

11/4/2016: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Musclewood Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant); Edward Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Nicole Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Nicole Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Nicole Bautista (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Musclewood Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (to Extend time to File Memorandum of Costs and Motion for Attorney Fees) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Order Granting ex parte application to extend time to file memorandum of costs and notice and motion for attorney's fees following Reverse and Remand by the Court of Appeals; Filed by Musclewood Investment Properties, LLC (Defendant); Edward Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON EDWARD LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON MUSCLEWOOD INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONEERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Nicole Bautista (Plaintiff); Oscar Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES: FOR DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE DISABLED PERSON ACT; THE BANE ACT; 4EGLIGENCE (CA.1.CIV.CODE 54 ET SEQ. ALCIV.CODE 52.1 ET SEQ, CAL. EVID. CODE 699)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC597411    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 20

Tentative Ruling

Judge David J. Cowan

Department 20


Hearing Date: Monday, February 24, 2020

Case Name: Bautista, et al. v. Musclewood Investment Properties, LLC, et al.

Case No.: BC597411

Motion: Leave to File Cross-Complaint

Moving Party: Defendants Edward Lopez and Musclewood Property Investment, LLC

Responding Party: *UNOPPOSED*

Notice: OK


Recommended Ruling: Defendants’ Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint is GRANTED. 

Defendants are ordered to file the proposed Cross-Complaint under separate cover within 10 days of this ruling.

The Court now sets a hearing re: service of the cross-complaint for June 4, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 20.

Moving party to give notice.


ANALYSIS

Defendants Edward Lopez and Musclewood Property Investment, LLC seek leave to file a cross-complaint under CCP sec. 426.50 on the grounds that the proposed cross-complaint states related causes of action arising out of the same occurrence as the complaint and that Defendants acted in good faith in bringing this motion as soon as reasonably possible. “A motion to file a cross-complaint at any time during the course of the action must be granted unless bad faith of the moving party is demonstrated where forfeiture would otherwise result.” (Silver Organizations Ltd. v. Frank (1990) 217 Cal.App.3d 94, 98-99) A finding of bad faith must be supported by substantial evidence. (Id. at 99) “The granting of leave to file a cross-complaint is particularly of importance in avoiding forfeiture of causes of action because of the principle expressed in [CCP sec. 426.30] that cross-complaints relating to the subject of the action must be filed therein or are deemed lost.” (Foot’s Transfer Storage Co. v. Superior Court (1980) 114 Cal.App.3d 897, 900)

The underlying complaint states a cause of action for discrimination under the California Disabled Persons Act based on alleged attacks on Plaintiff’s guide dog by Defendants’ “guard dog.” Defendants’ cross-complaint alleges cross-defendants owned the dog and failed to restrain it—and are thus responsible instead under theories of equitable and comparative indemnity. These causes of action clearly relate to the subject of the underlying action, and so granting leave to file a cross-complaint “is particularly of importance” here. (Foot’s Transfer, supra, at 900)

Defendants have established they acted in good faith in bringing this motion as soon as reasonably possible, in light of post-remand settlement discussions, discovery, and certain extenuating circumstances requiring the continuance of earlier-set hearing dates on this Motion. There is no evidence of any bad faith, and no opposition has been filed. Accordingly, the motion must be granted under Silver Organizations.

CONCLUSION

Defendants’ Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint is GRANTED.

Defendants are ordered to file the proposed Cross-Complaint under separate cover within 10 days of this ruling. The Court sets a hearing re: service of the cross-complaint for June 4, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 20.

Moving party to give notice.