This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2016 at 20:42:38 (UTC).

NICK BRANDSRUD VS BURBANK POLICE AGENCY

Case Summary

On 01/26/2015 NICK BRANDSRUD filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against BURBANK POLICE AGENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3514

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDSRUD NICK

Defendants

BURBANK POLICE AGENCY

CITY CLERK'S OFFICE IN BURBANK FOR THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BARNES CAROYN A. CITY ATTORNEY

BARLOW DENNIS A. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/6/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/2/2015: Minute Order

ORDER

6/2/2015: ORDER

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/16/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS TO THE CITY OF BURBANK; AND NOTICE OF REQUEST

7/16/2015: DEFENDANT CITY OF BURBANK'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR MOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS TO THE CITY OF BURBANK; AND NOTICE OF REQUEST

Minute Order

10/13/2015: Minute Order

ORDER

10/15/2015: ORDER

ORDER AND JUDGMENT RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/30/2015: ORDER AND JUDGMENT RE DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • Judgment (/order ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Order (ruling on submitted matter of 10/13/15 ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Demurrer (TO FAC 10/13/15 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Order (demurrer sustained w/20 days to amend ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Defendant's Demurrer ( NO HEARING DATE IN D-45 FILED IN BURBANK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (AND DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT OF ALTERNATIVELY, FORMOTION TO STRIKE THE COMPLAINT AS TO THE CITY OF BURBANK; AND REQUEST TO TAKE JU- DICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 452(d) OF BC566654) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Notice (OF RELATED CASE TO BC566654 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Complaint Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED AS TO NICK BRANDSRUD ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Request-Waive Court Fees (AS TO NICK BRANDSRUD ) Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Summons Filed Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (NO FEE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.55 ) Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

CX)\JO)U'I#ODN—\O(OCD\JCDCHJSOON—\

’.l . v "‘

AMELIA ANN ALBANO, CITY ATTORNEY

State Bar No. 103640 | LED CAROLYN A. BARNES, SR. A T CITY ATTY. Sigarior Court of Calioria State Bar No. 113313 . > Angeles 275 E. Olive Avenue %% ,&‘% | OCT 30 2015 Burbank, CA 91502 @% % & Sherr . g el (818) 238-5707 6\ <. B Y er. mc,uuve Officer/ClariX] (818) 238-5724 O @?g —eX feries= oeni ] Attorney for Defendant CITY BURBANK ”E-; o

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES . Receiveq 0c NICK BRANDSRUD Case No.: EC063514 T'20 20;5 Plaintiff, ORDER AND JUDGMEN#RE

DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED

PASADENA,THE CITY ATTONREY

) ) ) ) ) THE CITY ATTORNEY'’S OFFICE OF ; OFFICE OF BURBANK ;

Defendant

TO PLAINTIFF:

ING FEE EXEMPT

&SUANT TO GOV. CODE § 6103

D2 45 COMPLAINT

Upon reading and hearing the Demurrer of Defendant City of Burbank,

erroneously sued as the City Attorney’s office of Burbank, to Plaintiff's First Amended

Complaint and the oral argument at the hearing, the Court sustained, without leave to

amend, the demurrer to the Complaint.

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of Burbank’s Demurrer to the First

Amended Complaint is sustained without leave to amend and that judgment is entered

in favor of Defendant City of Burbank and against Plaintiff Nick Brandsrud. The Court’s

ruling is attached as Exhibit “A”.

Defendant is also entitled to the amount of its costs

which will be determined upon an appropriate application and showing by Defendant.