This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:19:56 (UTC).

NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC VS NGL LOGISTICS

Case Summary

On 05/22/2015 NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NGL LOGISTICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0606

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGL TRANSPORTATION LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

LEE JAI JOON

NGL LOGISTICS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. AXTELL

J.J. KIM & ASSOCIATES PC

Defendant Attorney

KAVALLER MILES L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • at 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NGL LOGISTICS, LLC (Defendant); JAI JOON LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • at 08:31 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by NGL LOGISTICS, LLC (Defendant); JAI JOON LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by NGL LOGISTICS, LLC (Defendant); JAI JOON LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Summons; Filed by NGL LOGISTICS, LLC (Defendant); JAI JOON LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Answer; Filed by NGL LOGISTICS, LLC (Defendant); JAI JOON LEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by NGL TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NGL TRANSPORTATION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NGL LOGISTICS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant