This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2019 at 02:32:09 (UTC).

NGHIA CAM LY VS PEARL NGAI

Case Summary

On 04/13/2012 NGHIA CAM LY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEARL NGAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MINTO, R. BRUCE, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, HALM, HOWARD L., CHARLES F. PALMER and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3608

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MINTO, R. BRUCE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

HALM, HOWARD L.

CHARLES F. PALMER

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LY NGHIA CAM

NGUYEN LAM VI THUY

Defendants

LEUNG ANDY

LEUNG CHARLES

PEARL NGAI

NGAI PEARL

Other

THE TAILLIEU LAW FIRM LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER ELEANOR L. ESQ.

CARPENTER JOHN C. ESQ.

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorneys

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LAW OFFICES OF

MACKIE CRAIG W. ESQ

THE TAILLIEU LAW FIRM LLP

MACKIE CRAIG W.ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION

11/19/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND/OR FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES

11/19/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND/OR FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES

DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING ANY OPINION TESTIMONY FROM JEFFREY SCHAEFFER, PH.D.; AND DECLARATION OF RONALD ZUREK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/24/2014: DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING ANY OPINION TESTIMONY FROM JEFFREY SCHAEFFER, PH.D.; AND DECLARATION OF RONALD ZUREK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESS LESTER ZACKLER M.D.; DECLARATION OF RONALD ZUREK IN SUPPORT

11/24/2014: DEFENDANT MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESS LESTER ZACKLER M.D.; DECLARATION OF RONALD ZUREK IN SUPPORT

DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESSES ON DIRECT EXAMINATION

11/24/2014: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESSES ON DIRECT EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

12/3/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

[PROPOSED) JOINT WITNESS LIST

12/8/2014: [PROPOSED) JOINT WITNESS LIST

JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

12/8/2014: JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

12/10/2014: DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2

TRIAL BRIEF RE APPLICABILITY OF CACI 452 - SUDDEN EMERGENCY

2/11/2015: TRIAL BRIEF RE APPLICABILITY OF CACI 452 - SUDDEN EMERGENCY

DECLARATION OF OLIVIER TAILLIEU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING PRECLUDING DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESSES

2/13/2015: DECLARATION OF OLIVIER TAILLIEU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING PRECLUDING DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESSES

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' USE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AT TRIAL; DECLARATION OF JOHN C. CARPENTER

2/23/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' USE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AT TRIAL; DECLARATION OF JOHN C. CARPENTER

Minute Order

2/25/2015: Minute Order

SPECIAL VERDICT

2/27/2015: SPECIAL VERDICT

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF ON MEDICAL BILLS

3/2/2015: PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF ON MEDICAL BILLS

Minute Order

3/23/2015: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF LAM VI NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ADDITUR

4/17/2015: DECLARATION OF LAM VI NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ADDITUR

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

5/11/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2016
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Remittitur filed (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 7/19/16 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • REMITTITUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (ACKNOWLEDGMENT - FULL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by NGHIA CAM LY (Plaintiff); LAM VI THUY NGUYEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Notice (OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
390 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2012
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (AS TO NGHIA CAM LY, ONLY W/PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by NGHIA CAM LY (Plaintiff); LAM VI THUY NGUYEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less