This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 15:34:40 (UTC).

NEWPORT INSURANCE COMPANY VS. DIAMOND BUILDERS INC, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2013 NEWPORT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DIAMOND BUILDERS INC, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7145

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DIAMOND BUILDERS INC

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

DIAMOND HOME BUILDERS INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROTEFELD HOFFMAN SCHLEITER

Defendant Attorney

NETZAH & JANKIELEWICZ LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/22/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/21/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

5/21/2013: Unknown

Unknown

6/11/2013: Unknown

Minute Order

6/12/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

7/17/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/29/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2014
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Proof of Services by Mail (OF NTC OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons (FIRST AMENED COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • First Amended Complaint (NO SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newport Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where DIAMOND BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant