Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:43:01 (UTC).

NEWPORT HOME LOAN INC VS SYLVIA P BRASWELL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 NEWPORT HOME LOAN INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SYLVIA P BRASWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0705

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NEWPORT HOME LOAN INC.

Defendants and Respondents

BRASWELL SYLVIA P.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAY MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

LITTLE JAMES J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/17/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY BY SALE; AND QUIET TITLE

8/17/2016: COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY BY SALE; AND QUIET TITLE

Minute Order

8/23/2016: Minute Order

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

8/23/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/25/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/6/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/6/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/20/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

10/26/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/2/2016: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/2/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

11/14/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/14/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

11/16/2016: NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/8/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Notice of Trial; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Case Management Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Newport Home Loan, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY BY SALE; AND QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Newport Home Loan, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT HOME LOAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAY MICHAEL D. ESQ.