This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 00:32:33 (UTC).

NEWCODS LLC VS SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT,INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2012 NEWCODS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9160

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWCODS LLC

Defendants

KAUR KANWALJIT

PRINCE CORP.

SHERMAN CARWASH

SHERMAN WAY CARWASH

SINGH KARMJIT

SURJIT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

CARWASH SHERMAN

CARWASH SHERMAN WAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHI PARDEEP

SINGH KARMJIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • Default Judgment; Filed by PRINCE CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • at 08:30 AM in Department Q; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • at 2:00 PM in Department Q; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • at 1:30 PM in Department Q; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • at 10:00 AM in Department Q; (Trial Previously Started; Trial Resumes) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • at 09:30 AM in Department Q; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by KANWALJIT KAUR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Declaration; Filed by KANWALJIT KAUR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Declaration; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Notice-Rejection of Judgm Package; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Notice-Demurrer; Filed by PRINCE CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Summons Filed; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by NEWCODS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWCODS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PRINCE INCORPORATED is a litigant