This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 18:07:23 (UTC).

NAZMUN ULLAH ET AL VS JAMES DELANEY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 NAZMUN ULLAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES DELANEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0356

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

ULLAH NAZMUN

Defendants and Respondents

DELANEY JAMES

DOES 1 TO 50

Minors

ULLAH FARHAN

ULLAH FUCHSIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SILVERMAN & GOLDSZER

Defendant Attorney

HUMMEL BRIAN GEORGE ESQ.

Other Attorneys

GOLDSZER RONALD ISAAC ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/17/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION RE: TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES OFF CALENDAR TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC

1/19/2018: STIPULATION RE: TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES OFF CALENDAR TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC

COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: COMPLAINT

Notice of Settlement

10/15/2018: Notice of Settlement

Notice

10/17/2018: Notice

Declaration

4/11/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/5/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Minute Order

4/20/2017: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?EX PARTE

5/24/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

5/24/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

Minute Order

6/20/2017: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

10/12/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

11/21/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/21/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/21/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/14/2017: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Settlement ((conditional Settlement)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Settlement (conditional Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration (Declarartion of Ronald I Goldszer RE OSC for Failure to File Application for Minor's Compromise of Disputed Claim); Filed by Nazmun Ullah (Plaintiff); Farhan Ullah (Legacy Party); Fuchsia Ullah (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Notice (of ruling RE FSC, Trial date and order to show cause); Filed by James Delaney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference; Court Order Pursuant to Notice of C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by Nazmun Ullah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Third Amended Complaint; Filed by Nazmun Ullah (Plaintiff); Farhan Ullah (Legacy Party); Fuchsia Ullah (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-04-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Nazmun Ullah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC600356    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

FUCHSIA ULLAH, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JAMES DELANEY, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC600356

ORDER DENYING EXPEDITED PETITIONS TO APPROVE COMPROMISES OF MINORS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 3

Plaintiffs, Nazmun, Farhan, and Fuchsia Ullah filed this action against Defendant, James Delaney for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Farhan and Fuchsia are minors and are appearing in the action through their mother, Nazmun.

The parties have agreed to settle the case for the total amount of $30,000, which is the policy limit on Defendant’s policy. $500 of the settlement is allocated to Farhan, $10,000 to Fuchsia, and $25,000 to their mother, Nazmun. If the settlement is approved, each minor plaintiff will pay small amounts in medical expenses and 25% in attorneys’ fees; the remaining amounts will be deposited in a blocked account.

The petitions are denied without prejudice for the following reasons:

· ¶3 is not filled out.

· Attachment 13 fails to explain the reasons for the apportionment of the settlement between the three plaintiffs. Instead, Petitioner indicates there has “not been any apportionment” of the settlement. This is erroneous. The total settlement is for $30,000, which is Defendant’s insurance policy limit. The parties made a determination of how to allocate that $30,000 between each of the three plaintiffs, and the basis for that decision must be disclosed.

· There is no attorney declaration explaining the basis for the fee, and any fee retainer agreement is not attached. Petitioner must provide required Attachment 15a in this regard.

· ¶19b is erroneous. Counsel is clearly receiving a fee in connection with each of the three plaintiffs’ settlements. The fee associated with the other two plaintiffs must be disclosed in each petition.

· ¶20 appears to be erroneous. Petitioner indicate there is a “guardianship of the estate of the minor.” If this is true, there must be an associated probate court case listed. Appointment of a guardian ad litem is not tantamount to a guardianship of the estate of the minor. Petitioner must either list the probate court case number in which the guardianship was created or choose one of the options from ¶20b for distribution of the proceeds of the settlement.

· There is no proof of service of the petition on Defendant.

Dated this 10th day of January 10, 2020

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court