This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 18:08:45 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING INC VS WESTER ELECTRIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 NATIONAL FUNDING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTER ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4401

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIONAL FUNDING INC4

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

WESTER ELECTRIC

WESTER DEAN

WESTER ELECTRIC INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALISIAN | LEE LLP

Defendant Attorney

BLOCK BRANDON A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DECLAR4TON OF DEAN WESTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/3/2016: DECLAR4TON OF DEAN WESTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Unknown

9/7/2016: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED OF DEFENDANT WESTER ELECTRIC, INC., AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

9/9/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST QUALIFIED OF DEFENDANT WESTER ELECTRIC, INC., AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DEAN WESTER AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

9/9/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DEAN WESTER AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANTS

10/18/2016: DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANTS

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANTS

10/18/2016: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANTS

DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/3/2017: DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER

1/17/2017: ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

3/15/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

ORDER

4/14/2017: ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

4/19/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTIONS TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order

5/19/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: STRIKING ENTITY'S ANSWER

6/6/2017: NOTICE OF RULING RE: STRIKING ENTITY'S ANSWER

JUDGMENT

7/12/2017: JUDGMENT

REQUEST TO FIX ATTORNEYS' FEES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214; ETC

7/12/2017: REQUEST TO FIX ATTORNEYS' FEES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214; ETC

DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/12/2017: DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 45; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST TO FIX ATTORNEYS' FEES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO GRANT ATTORNEYS' FEES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF COURT 3.214; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Wester Electric, Inc (Defendant); Dean Wester (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LOAN AGREEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by National Funding, Inc4 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Electric Company, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant