This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:16:39 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING INC VS HECTOR CONTRERAS INSURANCE SERVICES

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 NATIONAL FUNDING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HECTOR CONTRERAS INSURANCE SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4440

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIONAL FUNDING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

CONTRERAS HECTOR

HC INSURANCE SERVICES

HECTOR CONTRERAS INSURANCE SERVICES LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SALISIAN | LEE LLP

MUREN TARA ESQ

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/7/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

11/21/2018: Unknown

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/17/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/4/2016: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

1/19/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

1/23/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO RESERVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE

3/10/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO RESERVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE

Minute Order

4/27/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANT HECTOR CONTREKAS

6/19/2017: DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST DEFENDANT HECTOR CONTREKAS

Proof of Service

6/19/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

9/7/2017: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

9/28/2017: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/29/2017: DECLARATION OF SANDRA OTERO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/29/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Service

9/29/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

9/29/2017: DECLARATION FOR COMPUTATION OF LEGAL INTEREST TO BE INCLUDED IN THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order

10/3/2017: Minute Order

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((LOS ANGELES)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by National Funding, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2016
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by National Funding, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN LOAN AGREEMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by National Funding, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC634440    Hearing Date: March 29, 2021    Dept: 34

SUBJECT: Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

Moving Party: Judgment Creditor National Funding, Inc.

Resp. Party: None

TENTATIVE RULING:

The application for order for appearance and examination is GRANTED.

BACKGROUND:

On September 20, 2016, Plaintiff National Funding, Inc. commenced this action against Defendants Hector Contreras Insurance Services LLC d/b/a HC Insurance Services and Hector Contreras for (1) breach of contract and (2) breach of guaranty.

On September 28, 2017, pursuant to the motion for summary judgment and application for default judgment of Plaintiff National Funding, Inc., the Court entered judgment “in favor of National Funding and against defendants Hector Contreras Insurance Services LLC d/b/a HC Insurance Services (‘HC Insurance’) and Hector Contreras (‘Contreras’) (collectively, ‘Defendants’), jointly and severally, in the amount of $97,800.48.” (09/28/2017 Judgment, p. 2:2-8.)

On February 16, 2021, Judgment Creditor National Funding, Inc. filed the instant application and order for appearance and examination of Judgment Debtor Hector Contreras, individually and as PMK for Hector Contreras Insurance Services LLC, d/b/a/ HC Insurance Services.

On March 8, 2021, Judgment Creditor filed a proof of service, demonstrating that Judgment Debtor was personally served with copies of the application and order for appearance and examination on March 5, 2021.

ANALYSIS:

I. Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (a) provides:

“The judgment creditor may apply to the proper court for an order requiring the judgment debtor to appear before the court, or before a referee appointed by the court, at a time and place specified in the order, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of the money judgment.”

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (d) states:

“The judgment creditor shall personally serve a copy of the order on the judgment debtor not less than 10 days before the date set for the examination. Service shall be made in the manner specified in Section 415.10. Service of the order creates a lien on the personal property of the judgment debtor for a period of one year from the date of the order unless extended or sooner terminated by the court.”

II. Discussion

The Court finds that Judgment Debtor was properly served with an order for appearance and examination. (Code Civ. Proc., § 708.110 subd. (d).)

The Court GRANTS Judgment Creditor’s application for order for appearance and examination.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant