This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 12:39:51 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. VS. LA PERRA BRAVA PRODUCE

Case Summary

On 09/09/2008 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LA PERRA BRAVA PRODUCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HICKOK, PHILIP H., BRIAN F. GASDIA, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ, ALLEN, WILLIAM A. and BIRNEY, WILLIAM J. JR.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1782

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HICKOK, PHILIP H.

BRIAN F. GASDIA

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

ALLEN, WILLIAM A.

BIRNEY, WILLIAM J. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC.

SMITH BLAIR

Defendants

LA PERRA BRAVA PRODUCE CORPORATION

LOZA ARTURO

LOZA-SANCHEZ OSCAR

LOZA-SANCHEZ ARTURO

SANCHEZ ARTURO

LOZA ALICIA

3JS PRODUCE INC.

LOZA OSCAR

Not Classified By Court

HARN WILLIAM DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BESNYL GLENN A. ATTORNEY AT LAW

BESNYL GLENN A.

Defendant Attorneys

REICH JACOB

GONZALEZ REFUGIO J.

SHIKES & SZOCS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER OF PLAINTIFF'S FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO SELL DWELLING

1/21/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER OF PLAINTIFF'S FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO SELL DWELLING

Order - ORDER HEARING 2-26-20

2/26/2020: Order - ORDER HEARING 2-26-20

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO SELL JUDGMENT DEBTOR ARTURO LOZA'S DWELLING AT AUCTION

2/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO SELL JUDGMENT DEBTOR ARTURO LOZA'S DWELLING AT AUCTION

Application for and Renewal of Judgment

3/3/2020: Application for and Renewal of Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/3/2020: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

3/6/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Writ - Return

3/9/2020: Writ - Return

Substitution of Attorney -

9/10/2018: Substitution of Attorney -

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

1/3/2019: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/24/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

1/24/2019: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling - APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF SALE OF DWELLING AMENDED

3/26/2019: Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling - APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF SALE OF DWELLING AMENDED

Proof of Service by Mail

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Posting

4/2/2019: Proof of Service by Posting

Order - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE MADE

4/5/2019: Order - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE MADE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF SALE OF DWELLING)

4/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF SALE OF DWELLING)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/22/19

5/22/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/22/19

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Renewal of Judgment); Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketApplication for and Renewal of Judgment; Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order Authorizing Sheriff to Sell Judgment Debtor Arturo Loza's Dwelling At Auction); Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Order Directing Sheriff to Sell Judgment Debtor's Real Property to Highest Bidder at Auction) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Order Directing Sheriff ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC051782    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: SEC

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. v. LA PERRA BRAVA PRODUCE

CASE NO.: VC051782

HEARING: 2/18/20

JUDGE: OLIVIA ROSALES

#15

TENTATIVE ORDER

Judgment Creditor National Commercial Recovery Inc.’s motion for an order authorizing Sherriff to sell judgment debtor Arturo Loza’s dwelling to highest bidder at auction is DENIED as to the request for permission to accept the highest bid that exceeds the amount of the minimum bid pursuant to CCP § 704.00(b)(1).

Instead, this court will issue a new order for sale of the homestead at the next highest bid of $425,000.00. (CCP § 704.800(b)(2).)

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Judgment Creditor National Commercial Recovery Inc. moves the court for an order authorizing to sell the dwelling to the highest bidder at the sheriff’s auction sale.

“If no bid is received at the sale of a homestead pursuant to a court order for sale that is 90 percent or more of the fair market value determined pursuant to Section 704.780, the homestead shall not be sold unless the court, upon motion of the judgment creditor, does one of the following: (1) Grants permission to accept the highest bid that exceeds the amount of the minimum bid required by subdivision (a). (2) Makes a new order for sale of the homestead.” (CCP § 704.800(b).)

Judgment Creditor presents evidence that they obtained multiple bidders at the minimum sale amount of $224,847.70, but was unable to obtain bidders at the 90% market value of $472,500.00.

Pursuant to CCP § 704.800(b)(2), this court will issue a new order for sale of the homestead at the next highest bid of $425,000.00.

Case Number: VC051782    Hearing Date: February 18, 2020    Dept: SEC

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. v. LA PERRA BRAVA PRODUCE

CASE NO.: VC051782

HEARING: 2/18/20

Calendar Matter#5

TENTATIVE ORDER

Judgment Creditor National Commercial Recovery Inc.’s motion for an order authorizing Sherriff to sell judgment debtor Arturo Loza’s dwelling to highest bidder at auction is CONTINUED to Wednesday, February 26, 2020 in Dept. SEC at 1:30 PM.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.