Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 03:42:27 (UTC).

NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT VS. JACOB TIKOSK

Case Summary

On 03/13/2014 NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACOB TIKOSK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2210

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEN-SHITRIT NATHAN

Defendants

TIKOSKY JACOB

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

TIKOSKY JACOB AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-20

YEHUDA YORAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISSMAN AARON J.

NOVIAN FARID .

Defendant Attorneys

BERKE MICHAEL NORMAN

BERKE MICHAEL N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • Notice (CLARIFYING TRIAL CONTINUANCE OF CONSOLIDATED CASES ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Stipulation & Order (STIP AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Declaration (DECLARATION RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING RE STIPULATION TO CON- TINUE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Notice (NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Notice-Incoming Case Transfer Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JACOB TIKOSKY ON 5/20/14 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney-Cross Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Demurrer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney-Cross Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2014
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (TO ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMURRERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Notice-Related Cases ( REL/W - LC083978) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Cross-complaint filed ( DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THIS X-COMP. ON 7/25/14 ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Summons-Issued Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC122210    Hearing Date: November 23, 2020    Dept: T

NATHAN BEN-SHITRIT,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JACOB TIKOSKY; et. al.

Defendants,

And related actions...

CASE NO: LC083978 c/w SC122210

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

Dept. T

8:30 a.m.

November 23, 2020

[TENTATIVE] ORDER: The Motion for Attorney’s Fees in the amount of $87,340.80 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE or in the alternative CONTINUE.

Introduction

Defendant Jacob Tikosky (“Defendant”) moves for an order awarding attorneys’ fees against Plaintiff Nathan Ben-Shitrit (“Plaintiff”) in the amount of $87,340.80. The motion is unopposed.

Discussion

Within the Court’s Statement of Decision, Defendant was ruled to be the prevailing party in relation to attorney’s fees on the Cross-Complaint in LC083978 and the Complaint in consolidated case SC12210. (Statement of Decision, ¿¿3A, B and 4.) Defendant submits his entitlement to attorney’s fees pursuant the Settlement Agreement’s attorney’s fees provision. (Berke Decl. ¿9, Exh. 2: Settlement Agreement, ¿8 – Admitted into evidence as Exhibit 200 in case no. SC122210.) As such, the only issue remaining is to determine whether the amount in fees is reasonable. The Court finds that the amount is not found to be reasonable because Counsel’s declaration, as well as the entries in the invoices, do not reflect the work performed in the defense of the complaint and prosecution of the cross-complaint in case no. SC122210. This action involved several different lawsuits. Without proper itemization of the billing entries showing work performed on SC122210, the Court is at a loss to determine the reasonableness of the fees and/or whether the work performed specifically applied to case no. SC122210.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE MICHAEL N