This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 10:04:07 (UTC).

NATALIA KULNEVICH ET AL VS PAVEL VOLODKOVICH ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2013 NATALIA KULNEVICH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PAVEL VOLODKOVICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, RICHARD E. RICO, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, RANDY RHODES and JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3251

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

RICHARD E. RICO

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RANDY RHODES

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BOTVINKEY ANDREY

KULNEVICH NATALIA

LOLA SHMELNIK [BC504011]

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ESTATE OF PAVEL VOLOKKOVICH THE

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

SHNAIDER VLADIMIR

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

SS CAL

STELLAR AUTO INC.

TORRENEGRA DAVID JESUS MONTENEGRO

TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION THE

USED CAR CLUB THE

VLADISLAV PICHUGAN

VOLODKOVICH PAVEL

VOLODKOVICH SVETLANA

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE [BC504011]

SS CAL-PACIFIC INC.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE [BC516815]

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

D B L R SEVEN LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY

Defendants and Respondents

SHNAIDER VLADIMIR

STELLAR AUTO INC.

TORRENEGRA DAVID JESUS MONTENEGRO

TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION THE

USED CAR CLUB THE

VLADISLAV PICHUGAN

VOLODKOVICH SVETLANA

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE [BC504011]

SS CAL-PACIFIC INC.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE [BC516815]

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ALDER LAW PC

ALDERLAW PC [BC504011]

L/O OF DANIEL V. BEHESNILIAN [BC516815]

TSELNER ARKADY A.

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BERGSTEN ROBERT T. ESQ.

GEUSS GARY G. SENIOR ASSITANT CITY ATTY

HANSEN & RUTHERFORD LLP [BC504011]

HANSEN & RUTHERFORD LLP [BC516815]

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN & HOUGH [BC504011]

HOWES MARLIN E. ESQ.

LAFER MARC S. ESQ.

MARLIN E. HOWES [BC516815]

MARLIN HOWES

MICHAEL N. FEUER CITY ATTORNEY

PURCELL BYRON MICHAEL ESQ.

THE GINDER LAW GROUP [BC504011]

WILLENKEN WILSON LOH & DELGADO [BC516815]

WILLIS DEPASQUALE LLP

ZUREK RONALD

31 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Other - - OTHER - PI TRANSFER ORDER

3/9/2015: Other - - OTHER - PI TRANSFER ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

3/9/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/10/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/10/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEFT SO CAL GAS CO.'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF KULNEVICH'S MIL #3

3/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEFT SO CAL GAS CO.'S OPPOSITION TO PLTF KULNEVICH'S MIL #3

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFT SO CAL GAS' OPP TO MIL #3

3/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFT SO CAL GAS' OPP TO MIL #3

Brief

3/11/2015: Brief

Brief

3/11/2015: Brief

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

3/12/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

243 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-03-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department F50; (Trial Previously Started; Matter Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-03-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department F50; (Trial Previously Started; Full Day of Trial Held) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-03-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department F50; (Trial Previously Started; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-03-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
713 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Natalia Kulnevich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Natalia Kulnevich (Plaintiff); Andrey Botvinkey (Plaintiff); SVETLANA VOLODKOVICH [BC516815] (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLAR AUTO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USED CAR CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where SS CAL-PACIFIC INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION THE is a litigant