This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 05:46:37 (UTC).

NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS AKOP YEPREMYAN

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AKOP YEPREMYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4717

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

YEPREMYAN AKOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROBER & RAPHAEL A LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

9/11/2018: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Other -

9/17/2018: Other -

Order

11/2/2018: Order

Minute Order

11/2/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

11/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Certificate of Mailing for

11/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim) of 11/02/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Order (Determining Claim of Exemption)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Claim of Exemption; Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Claim of Exemption; Filed by AKOP YEPREMYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Claim of Exemption; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department E; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCGE, Laura A. Matz, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (- FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH TRIAL COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Summons; Filed by NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued (- COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED; ACCOUNT STATED [CLAIM AMOUNT $37,511.88] - RECEIPT: GLN538418015 01-28-16); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC064717    Hearing Date: April 16, 2021    Dept: D

TENTATIVE RULING
Calendar:    10
Date:          4/16/2021
Case No: EC064717
Case Name: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company v. Fry  
CLAIM OF EXEMPTION 
(WAGE GARNISHMENT)
Moving Party:         Defendant/Judgment debtor Shindonna L. Fry     
Responding Party: Plaintiff/Judgment creditor Hartford Causualty Insurance Company    
RELIEF REQUESTED:
Exemption from enforcement of judgment by Wage Garnishment 
SUMMARY OF FACTS:
This is a subrogation action in which plaintiff Hartford Casualty Insurance Company seeks to recover funds it paid to its insured, Survival Insurance, Inc., pursuant to an insurance policy, which loss plaintiff alleges was due to the conduct of defendant Shindonna L. Fry in engaging in a systematic scheme pursuant to which defendant misappropriated and embezzled funds from Survival while employed as a director of income assistance. 
On January 14, 2008, the court entered judgment by the court by default against defendant in the sum of $57,437.00.  
Evidently, plaintiff, in an attempt to enforce the judgment, has attempted to garnish defendant’s wages.  It also appears that the Sheriff’s Office is holding personal property in the sum of $470.75.   
ANALYSIS:
Defendant/judgment debtor evidently filed with the sheriff’s department a claim of exemption from wage garnishment, requesting that the sum of $100 per pay period be withheld from her wages.   
Plaintiff/judgment creditor filed an opposition to the claim requesting a hearing date, and requesting that the sum of $200 per month be withheld from judgment debtor’s wages per pay period.  [Charness Decl., para. 4].   
Judgment debtor then contacted judgment creditor’s attorney and agreed to the $200 per pay period payment.  
The parties have entered into a letter agreement to this effect, dated January 4, 2021, which is submitted to the court, and judgment creditor requests that the court enter an order in accordance with the agreement that the sum of $200 per month be withheld from judgment debtor’s wages.  [Charness Decl., paras. 4-6, Ex. 1]. 
There has been nothing further filed by judgment debtor objecting to the court proceeding in this fashion, and the order is entered as requested. 
The judgment creditor has also filed with the court a Memo to Court Clerk which was received on January 7, 2021, which indicates that the sheriff’s office or financial institution as of January 5, 2021, is holding $470.74 in funds which have been levied in connection with this matter.  The court will hear argument at the hearing with respect to whether these funds will be ordered released to the judgment creditor as wages subject to the agreement of the parties or will be ordered returned to the judgment debtor.
RULING: 
Hearing on Claim of Exemption is GRANTED IN PART pursuant to the Letter Agreement submitted to the Court, which reflects that on January 4, 2021, the parties agreed to have the sum of $200 withheld per pay period from defendant/judgment debtor’s wages with defendant/judgment debtor’s employer.  The Court orders that $200 per bimonthly pay period be withheld.  
The Court will hear argument concerning whether the funds being held by the Sheriff’s Department in the sum of $470.74 as of January 5, 2021, will be ordered turned over to plaintiff/judgment creditor as wages subject to the parties’ agreement. 
GIVEN THE CORONAVIRUS CRISIS, AND TO PROMOTE APPROPRIATE SOCIAL DISTANCING, UNTIL FURTHER ORDERED, DEPARTMENT D IS ENCOURAGING AUDIO OR VIDEO APPEARANCES 
Please make arrangement in advance if you wish to appear via LACourtConnect by visiting www.lacourt.org, and scheduling a remote appearance.  Please note that LACourtConnect offers an audio-only appearance option at a current cost of $15.00 and a video appearance option at a cost of $23.00.   Counsel and parties (including self-represented litigants) are encouraged not to personally appear unless they have obtained advance permission of the Court.  Anyone who appears in person for the hearing will be required to comply with strict social distancing measures, including, but not limited to, assigned seating, capacity limitations in the courtroom, designated waiting areas, and strictly enforced spacing in line to communicate with court staff.  If no appearance is set up through LACourtConnect, or otherwise, then the Court will assume the parties are submitting on the tentative. 
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant