This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:26:29 (UTC).

NANKALI, ATOSSA VS NOWSHIRAVANI, JOHN

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 NANKALI, ATOSSA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NOWSHIRAVANI, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3790

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NANKALI ATOSSA

Respondent

NOWSHIRAVANI JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MCLEOD STEPHEN R.

MCLEOD STEPHEN RICHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Removed from Active Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Notice (NOTICE OF DEATH OF RESPONDENT ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Nowshiravani, John ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-10-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Declaration (COM PROP - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Support (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Nankali, Atossa - Hearing Set on 2017-02-27 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.