This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:16:49 (UTC).

NANCY LEHMAN VS ONEWEST BANK FSB ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2015 NANCY LEHMAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ONEWEST BANK FSB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9855

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NANCY LEHMAN

LEHMAN NANCY

Defendants

DOES 1 - 50 INC.

LAW OFFICE OF LES ZIEVE

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC

ONEWEST BANK FSB SUCSR INDYMAC BANK FSB

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP( FAC )

FENG LOCKE LORD LLP SIMON

HOUSER & ALLISON MARSALA

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP FAC

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BYRON G DANELL LAW OFFICE OF (B DANELL)

BYRON G DANELL LAW OFFICE OF B DANELL

Defendant Attorneys

HOUSER & ALLISON (MARSALA )

LAW OFFICE OF LES ZIEVE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

9/28/2018: Case Management Order

Minute Order

9/28/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department S28; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Case Management Order (Re: Disposition of Funds Posted in Trust); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 09:48 AM in Department S28; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • at 09:48 AM in Department S28; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by LOCKE LORD LLP (SIMON FENG) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Order; Filed by LOCKE LORD LLP (SIMON FENG) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by LOCKE LORD LLP (SIMON FENG) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Hearing on Motion to Quash ((Denied)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by ONEWEST BANK,FSB SUCSR INDYMAC BANK FSB (Defendant); OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC (Defendant); HOUSER & ALLISON (MARSALA ) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Order; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-01-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by NANCY LEHMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSER & ALLISON is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Onewest Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is a litigant