This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:35:48 (UTC).

NAMIRE TAYLOR VS MARCIO AMADOR CRUZ

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 NAMIRE TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARCIO AMADOR CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1069

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TAYLOR NAMIRE

Defendants and Respondents

CRUZ MARCIO AMADOR

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARKS MARYETTA C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/13/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/10/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/18/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

11/21/2016: Unknown

Unknown

12/15/2016: Unknown

SUMMONS

12/15/2016: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to enter default / alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal for failure to enter default / alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to enter defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (reproof of service) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (reentry of default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: re: proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Namire Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 44; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Namire Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Namire Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Namire Taylor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC641069    Hearing Date: July 27, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

namire taylor,

Plaintiff,

v.

marcio amador cruz,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC641069

Hearing Date: July 27, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

plaintiff’s motion to set aside dismissal

NOTICE

Department #32 will be dark for motions on Monday, July 27, 2020.  The parties are ordered to email the Court’s clerk at SSCDept32@lacourt.org to inform the clerk whether they are submitting on the Court’s tentative or whether they are requesting a hearing.  If any party requests a hearing, one will be scheduled.  If the parties do not email the Court’s clerk before the hearing time to request a hearing, they will waive the right to be heard and shall submit to this tentative order, which shall issue.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff Namire Taylor (“Plaintiff”) moves to set aside the Court’s order of August 14, 2019, in which the Court dismissed this action based upon Plaintiff’s counsel’s failure to appear at an Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal. Per Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivision (b), a court may “relieve a party or his or her legal representative from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against him or her through his or her mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or excusable neglect.” The party must seek such relief “within a reasonable time, in no case exceeding six months, after the judgment, dismissal, order, or proceeding was taken.” (Ibid.) “[W]hen relief under section 473 is available, there is a strong public policy in favor of granting relief and allowing the requesting party his or her day in court.” (Rappleyea v. Campbell (1994) 8 Cal.4th 975, 981-982, internal quotations omitted.)

Plaintiff proffers a declaration from his counsel, MaryEtta C. Marks (“Counsel”). Counsel states that she failed to appear at the hearing because of delays on public transportation. Plaintiff has shown that the Court’s dismissal of this matter was the result of Counsel’s inadvertence. The motion is therefore granted.

The Court notes that Plaintiff served Defendant Marcio Amador Cruz on December 1, 2018, but has yet to enter Defendant’s default. Therefore, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal on December 2, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Notice is not required, as Defendant has not appeared in this action.

DATED: July 27, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS MARYETTA C.