This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:34:43 (UTC).

MYLES EVANS VS. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 MYLES EVANS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4428

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANS MYLES

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BICKEL LAW FIRM INC.

Defendant Attorney

LEHRMAN LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/17/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

1/28/2016: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/28/2016: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Legacy Document

9/28/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/25/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/25/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/27/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/27/2017: Legacy Document

Request for Judicial Notice

2/10/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Legacy Document

2/14/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

2/15/2017: Legacy Document

Jury Instructions

2/16/2017: Jury Instructions

Legacy Document

2/16/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

2/21/2017: Legacy Document

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/28/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order

3/2/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

3/27/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

7/18/2018: Legacy Document

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Myles Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by BMW Of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Amended/Corrected Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Judgment AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2017
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by BMW Of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by BMW Of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
155 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2016
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Myles Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-12-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Answer; Filed by BMW Of North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Myles Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Myles Evans (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less