This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:22:41 (UTC).

MYERS POWER PRODUCTS INC VS PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS INC ET A

Case Summary

On 01/11/2016 MYERS POWER PRODUCTS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH R. FEFFER and LUIS A. LAVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6546

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

LUIS A. LAVIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MYERS POWER PRODUCTS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS INC.

DECHELLIS BRETT

PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.

MURICKAN GEO

DOES 1-50

DENNIS NEIL

ENGINEERED SPECIFICATION PRODUCTS INC.

ARENA NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARLSMITH BALL LLP

GOLDSTEIN JUSTIN MATTHEW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KRIEGER & KRIEGER L.C.

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

KRIEGER TERRENCE BRYANT

VOGELE THOMAS ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

5/31/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service

4/24/2018: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE RE: ORDFR I)ISSOLVING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER

7/27/2018: PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE RE: ORDFR I)ISSOLVING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER

REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER AMENDED RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY, SET NO. ONE

8/24/2018: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER AMENDED RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY, SET NO. ONE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: AUGUST 8, 2018 DISCOVERY HEARING

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: AUGUST 8, 2018 DISCOVERY HEARING

Order

10/18/2018: Order

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Order

3/4/2019: Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/13/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DECLARATION OF NATHAN J. MAZUREK SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE. AT PMQ DEPOSITION

7/21/2016: DECLARATION OF NATHAN J. MAZUREK SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE. AT PMQ DEPOSITION

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/25/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service

7/28/2016: Proof of Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/18/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

9/15/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DAVID M. ROSS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IN

1/26/2017: DECLARATION OF DAVID M. ROSS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR IN

PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION A

1/26/2017: PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION A

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/27/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS, INC., PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP., CEO MURICKAN, AND BRETT DECHELLIS TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED CO

11/2/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS, INC., PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP., CEO MURICKAN, AND BRETT DECHELLIS TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED CO

516 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Pioneer Custom Electrical Products Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Brett Dechellis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Pioneer Power Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Geo Murickan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Order (Proposed Errata Sheet to Reports and Recommendation Filed May 14, 2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice (of Trial Continuance); Filed by Myers Power Products, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Order (Proposed REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.?S AND PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS, INC.?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.?S DOCUMENT PRODUCTION REQUESTS, SET NOS. E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Order ([Proposed] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE: DEFENDANT PIONEER CUSTOM ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS CORP.?S AND PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS, INC.?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PLAINTIFF MYERS POWER PRODUCTS, INC.?S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION SETS NOS. 3 (PIONEER CEP) AND); Filed by Pioneer Custom Electrical Products Corp. (Defendant); Pioneer Power Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Proposed Report and Recommendation Re: Defendant Pioneer Custom Electrical Products Corp.'s And Pioneer Power Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Re Responses to Plaintiff Myers Power Products, Inc.'s Special Interrogatories, Set No. Five

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
982 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1)BREACH OF CONTRACT 2) BREACH OF CONFIDENCE, ETC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Myers Power Products, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC606546    Hearing Date: February 18, 2020    Dept: 74

BC606546 MYERS POWER PRODUCTS vs PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS

Plaintiff’s Motion to Bifurcate

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is DENIED. Plaintiff has agreed to have the court decide the equitable claims after the jury trial. The court will decide defendant Pioneer Power Solutions, Inc.’s alter ego status after trial on the legal issues because the jury’s determination may foreclose the need to determine alter ego liability.

Case Number: BC606546    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 74

BC606546 MYERS POWER PRODUCTS INC VS PIONEER POWER SOLUTIONS INC

Plaintiff’s Motion for Terminating Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is taken off calendar as stayed by the pending appeal.

This motion is based in large part of the argument that defendants failed to comply with the court’s order of November 26, 2019. Defendants have filed a notice of appeal of that order.

“[W]hether a matter is 'embraced' in or 'affected' by a judgment within the meaning of section 916 depends upon whether postjudgment trial court proceedings on the particular matter would have any impact on the 'effectiveness' of the appeal. If so, the proceedings are stayed….” (Franklin & Franklin v. 7-Eleven Owners for Fair Franchising (2000) 85 Cal. App. 4th 1168, 1173.)

Issuing a terminating sanction on the grounds, even partially on the grounds, that defendants failed to comply with the order is a particular matter which would have an impact on the effectiveness of the appeal. This motion is stayed pending the appeal.

The motion is taken off calendar.