This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 03:58:30 (UTC).

MURCIA, JOSE OMAR VS RAMIREZ, SANDRA GUADALUPE

Case Summary

On 09/01/2016 MURCIA, JOSE OMAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIREZ, SANDRA GUADALUPE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3380

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MURCIA JOSE OMAR

Respondent

RAMIREZ SANDRA GUADALUPE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 03-30-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-30 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-30 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Mail (SUM & PET - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Service Date on 2016-09-15 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (incomplete item #2 NOTICE OF REJECTION GIVEN - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (SUM & PET - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Signed on 2016-10-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (fl1000, 110, 120 ect... - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Signed on 2016-10-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 11-03-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Murcia, Jose - Granted on 2016-09-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.