This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 18:01:16 (UTC).

MURA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS PULTE HOME CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2010 MURA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ABRAHAM KHAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9475

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ABRAHAM KHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ACCI CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 400

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANEDA JOSEPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

6/7/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF REJECTION - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/1/2011: NOTICE OF REJECTION - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/6/2011: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORFLER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SETTLEM ENT

4/6/2011: NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORFLER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SETTLEM ENT

Minute Order -

4/5/2011: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

3/22/2011: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2011
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 51; (OSC RE Dismissal; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED ORFLER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: SETTLEM ENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Mura Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 51; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mura Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mura Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS&COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mura Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mura Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1, STRICT LIABILIJY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANEDA JOSEPH