This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 20:49:39 (UTC).

MORILLO CONSTRUCTION INC VS CITY OF PASADENA

Case Summary

On 11/27/2012 MORILLO CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and JAN A. PLUIM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6292

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

JAN A. PLUIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

MORILLO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants and Respondents

CITY OF PASADENA

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PASADENA CITY OF

THOMAS SHARI

ABEGUNRIN SEGUN

CURRIE PHYLLIS

WRIGHT STEVEN

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER & SENET LLP

Other

PECKAR & ABRAMSON P.C

Not Classified By Court

MYERS PAMELA L.

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

FELDMAN MARK ALLEN

SIRE DAVID J JR

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

FELDMAN MARK ALLEN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER SENET

CUNEO STEVEN R. JR. ESQ.

GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER & SENET LLP

SENET GIBBS GIDEN LOCHER TURNER

GADBOIS BARBARA RINGNESS

GADBOIS BARBARA RINGNESS ESQ.

RAD JAVAN NIKOMID

BAGNERIS MICHELE BEAL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/18/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

12/24/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-05-14 00:00:00

5/14/2015: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-05-14 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

9/4/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

12/11/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-02-19 00:00:00

2/19/2016: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2016-02-19 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

2/9/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-25 00:00:00

4/25/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-04-25 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

7/12/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

9/14/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION

Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS

8/8/2019: Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B294572

11/8/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B294572

Miscellaneous - APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

9/14/2018: Miscellaneous - APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

10/12/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine #5

10/18/2018: Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine #5

Declaration - Declaration Sara Kornblatt re meet & confer

10/18/2018: Declaration - Declaration Sara Kornblatt re meet & confer

Declaration - Declaration of Michael B. Geibel In Support of City of Pasadena's Motion For Award Of Attorney Fees

2/4/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Michael B. Geibel In Support of City of Pasadena's Motion For Award Of Attorney Fees

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/20/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

325 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Appeal in LEAD CASE BC496292 Morillo v. City of Pasadena) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Appeal in LEAD CASE BC49629...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by CITY OF PASADENA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B300270); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B294572); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA:08/26/19 B300270); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketOrder (on Motion to Tax Costs); Filed by Pasadena, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
435 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT OF MORILLO CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less