This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 04:49:47 (UTC).

MONSTER LLC ET AL VS BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/18/2015 MONSTER LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5235

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE NOEL

MONSTER LLC

Defendants

BEATS ELECTRONICS LLC

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

HTC AMERICA HOLDING INC

IOVINE JIMMY

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

WACHTER PAUL D

YOUNG ANDRE

WACHTER PAUL D.

HTC AMERICA HOLDING INC.

Not Classified By Court

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC.

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

LA DEPOSITIONS INC.

DORN SHAWNDA RENEE

Interested Party

W.LANCASTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

NURIK MARC S.

HALLAM KIRK M.

Defendant Attorneys

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

CORI GORDON MOORE

PERKINS COIE LLP

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP [CA-NORTH]

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP [CA-SOUTH]

BOIES SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP [WASH DC]

MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP [CA]

PERKINS COIE LLP [WA]

GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LAW OFFICES OF

[WA] PERKINS COIE LLP

[CA] PERKINS COIE LLP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF BOBBIE J. WILSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

9/18/2015: DECLARATION OF BOBBIE J. WILSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

COMPLAINT (1) NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO ADMIT DAVID P. I3URMAN, CORI GORDON MOORE, AND LUKE M. RONA TO APPEAR PRO HAC VIC?E; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; ETC

9/18/2015: COMPLAINT (1) NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION TO ADMIT DAVID P. I3URMAN, CORI GORDON MOORE, AND LUKE M. RONA TO APPEAR PRO HAC VIC?E; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC.?S DEMURRER RRO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

9/18/2015: DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA HOLDING, INC.?S DEMURRER RRO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF FIRI CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF FIRI CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

9/18/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF PAPERS AND PLEADINGS (X) NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF PAPERS AND PLEADINGS (X) NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, JIMMY 10 VINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER?S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER

9/18/2015: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, JIMMY 10 VINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER?S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER

VIEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND SAUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, JIMMY IOVINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER

9/18/2015: VIEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND SAUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, JIMMY IOVINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION RO TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

9/18/2015: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION RO TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS BY WILLIAM A. ISAACSON AND KAREN L. DUNN

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS BY WILLIAM A. ISAACSON AND KAREN L. DUNN

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

9/18/2015: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION BY WILLIAM A. ISAACSON AND KAREN L. DUNN

9/18/2015: ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION BY WILLIAM A. ISAACSON AND KAREN L. DUNN

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS TO THE REQUEST FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, HMMY IOVINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER

9/18/2015: OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS TO THE REQUEST FOR COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION OF DEFENDANTS BEATS ELECTRONICS, LLC, ANDRE YOUNG, HMMY IOVINE, AND PAUL D. WACHTER

PROOF OF SERVICE

9/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE

760 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Appeal - Notice Vacating Notice of Default; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Noel Lee (Plaintiff); Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Noel Lee (Plaintiff); Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL; NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED UNDER CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE. 8.124

    Read MoreRead Less
1,672 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Noel Lee (Plaintiff); Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by HTC America Holding, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Monster, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Notice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD AND DECEIT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF PLAINTIFFS CONCERNING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER AND TO DISMISS, AND BEATS AND INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS JOINT DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Beats Electronics, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTC America Holding, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Munger Tolles and Olson LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Beats Electronics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant