This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 09:12:41 (UTC).

MONSERRAT CEDILLO VS NGROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2014 MONSERRAT CEDILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NGROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2654

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDILLO MONSERRAT

Defendants

NGROUP INC.

TILLY'S INC.

WORLD OF JEANS AND TOPS

Other

ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASTEGAR FARZAD ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketSTIPULATION ANDJ ORDIR TO TRANSFER VENVE TO ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT NGROUP, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONSERRAT CEDILLOS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT NGROUP, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MONSERRAT CEDILLOS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Monserrat Cedillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Monserrat Cedillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Monserrat Cedillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION (PREGNANCY DISCRIMINATION, CALIFORNIA COY. CODE 12940(A)); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less