Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 16:24:06 (UTC).

MONICA AGUILERA VS FRAZEE INDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2013 MONICA AGUILERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRAZEE INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7367

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUILERA MONICA

Defendants and Respondents

ALONZO LUIS

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FRAZEE INDUSTRIES INC.

FRAZEE PAINT/COMEX GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF NATALYA VARTAPETOVA

THE OKOROCHA FIRM

SOTTILE * BALTAXE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SAXON MARK A.

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT (HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONIWENT) IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

4/30/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. SEXUAL HARASSMENT (HOSTILE WORK ENVIRONIWENT) IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/14/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/14/2013: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/30/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

6/26/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

Minute Order -

7/1/2013: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/12/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/15/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/30/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTJNG TRJAL AND RELATED DATES

7/30/2013: NOTICE OF SETTJNG TRJAL AND RELATED DATES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/16/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

8/21/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

8/27/2013: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order -

10/9/2013: Minute Order -

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • Docketat 03:50 pm in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Court Order - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AND ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Docketat 03:00 pm in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Court Order - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF SETTING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 72, RUTH ANN KWAN, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv (Notice to:Timothy B. ScottileFailure to file:Luis Alonzo, and Does 1 through100, inclusive) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketNtc and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (OF DEFTS FRAZEE INDUTSTRIES INC AND COMEX NORTH AMERICA INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: FRAZEE INDUSTRIES IN ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRAZEE INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saxon, Mark A