This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 13:01:30 (UTC).

MOISES AGUIRRE VS VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2015 MOISES AGUIRRE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0084

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUIRRE MOISES

Defendants and Respondents

ANDUZE NICHOLAS

CADILLAC HOTEL

HILTON EDWARD

KATEY KERRY

LUDERER JEFF

SINNATHAMBY SRIS

VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARSTEN LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC

4/28/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC

SUMMONS

4/28/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/21/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC.'S: (1) NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 170.6; ETC

6/19/2015: DEFENDANT VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC.'S: (1) NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 170.6; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/24/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

6/24/2015: ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/24/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

6/24/2015: ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF RULING RE 170.6 CCP REASSIGNMENT

6/29/2015: NOTICE OF RULING RE 170.6 CCP REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS VENICE DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S AND JEFF LUDERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MOISES AGUIRRE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/6/2015: DEFENDANTS VENICE DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S AND JEFF LUDERER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MOISES AGUIRRE'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/11/2015: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/25/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/4/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Moises Aguirre (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Venice Development, Inc. (Defendant); Jeff Luderer (Defendant); Sris Sinnathamby (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Venice Development, Inc. (Defendant); Jeff Luderer (Defendant); Sris Sinnathamby (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 34; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketDEFENDANT VENICE DEVELOPMENT INC.'S: (1) NOTICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 170.6; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Venice Development, Inc. (Defendant); Jeff Luderer (Defendant); Sris Sinnathamby (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Moises Aguirre (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less