This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:40:43 (UTC).

MOHAMMED POURNAMDARI, ET AL. VS. ARICA ASHTIN JOHNSON, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2012 MOHAMMED POURNAMDARI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARICA ASHTIN JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6864

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POURNAMDARI MOHAMMED

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

EMPLOYERS MUTURAL CASUALTY COMPANY A

JOHNSON ARICA ASHTIN

ONOMITSU CHIKAGE

ROES 1 TO 50

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ONOMITSU CHIKAGE

Not Classified By Court

FINGERMAN MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRSCH JOSHUA E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER P. LYON ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF GILSLEIDER & MAHON

STEINHART TERRAN T.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

4/18/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM CONTACT NUMBERS

5/23/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM CONTACT NUMBERS

Minute Order -

8/27/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ORDERS ISSUED AT POSTMEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE ON 8/27/13

8/30/2013: NOTICE OF ORDERS ISSUED AT POSTMEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE ON 8/27/13

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER

9/18/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND IPROPOSEDI ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/3/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

12/6/2013: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE RE MINUTE ORDER (12/16/13)

1/3/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE RE MINUTE ORDER (12/16/13)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP ?664.6

5/8/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP ?664.6

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO? CCP ?664.6

5/8/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO? CCP ?664.6

DECLARATION OF JOSHUA E. KJRSCH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP ?664.6

5/8/2014: DECLARATION OF JOSHUA E. KJRSCH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP ?664.6

STIPULATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT

5/8/2014: STIPULATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

5/8/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order -

6/3/2014: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT

6/18/2014: JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

6/18/2014: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/18/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

11/21/2014: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by ARICA ASHTIN JOHNSON (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver ( FOR COPIES ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees (FOR COPIES ); Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketCertificate of Facts re: Unsatisfied Judgment (plus Certified Judgment); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketCertificate of Unsatisfied Judgmt (ISSUED-MAILED OUT-AB; LAC457478047-11/06/14;); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal (OSC RE DISMISSAL OF DOES) - Hearing Previously Adv. and Vac.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (PARTY SERVED: ARICA ASHTIN JOHNSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MOHAMMED POURNAMDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by MOHAMMED POURNAMDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MOHAMMED POURNAMDARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYERS MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON CHRISTOPHER P. ESQUIRE