This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 04:19:49 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD SALEEM VS MUHAMMAD SALEEM MEMON ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2015 MOHAMMAD SALEEM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MUHAMMAD SALEEM MEMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4373

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALEEM MOHAMMAD

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

ELITE INTERNATIONAL

MEMON MUHAMMAD SALEEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN FENSTER

BERKE JEFF ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BEHESNILIAN DANIEL V. ESQ.

CERNYAR MICHAEL K.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BASED UPON FRAUD; ETC

1/12/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT BASED UPON FRAUD; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF JEFF BERKE IN SUPPORT

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF JEFF BERKE IN SUPPORT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

2/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS

3/4/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

3/4/2015: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/1/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/15/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/20/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/25/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/2/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETEING AND TRIAL PREPARATION

7/8/2015: ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETEING AND TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order

7/8/2015: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/8/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Mohammad Saleem (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 73; (Motion to Vacate; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Mohammad Saleem (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Mohammad Saleem (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF JEFF BERKE IN SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2015
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mohammad Saleem (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Mohammad Saleem (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHESNILIAN DANIEL V. ESQ.