This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 09:02:53 (UTC).

MODERN AUCTIONS INC VS PAUL-CHARLES VALMORBIDA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 MODERN AUCTIONS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAUL-CHARLES VALMORBIDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3194

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MODERN AUCTIONS INC.

LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

Defendants and Respondents

VALMORBIDA PAUL-CHARLES

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

VALMORBIDA P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/9/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

3/9/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/1/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN AUCTIONS INC. is a litigant