This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 14:06:51 (UTC).

MODERN AUCTIONS INC ET AL VS BENJAMIN STORCK

Case Summary

On 03/24/2016 MODERN AUCTIONS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENJAMIN STORCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4625

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

MODERN AUCTIONS INC.

LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

MODERN AUCTIONS INC. DBA LOS ANGELES MODERN AUCTIONS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

STORCK BENJAMIN

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

GALERIE XX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN

MEDIONI DANIEL M

MARCA MATTHEW DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FRIEDMAN ANDREW ESQ.

TEITELBAUM MELVIN

Other Attorneys

WHITE JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

3/7/2018: Cross-Complaint

PLAINTIFF MODERN AUCTIONS, INC.''S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO CONFIRM THAT THE CASE WILL NOT BE TRIED TO A JURY

5/16/2018: PLAINTIFF MODERN AUCTIONS, INC.''S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO CONFIRM THAT THE CASE WILL NOT BE TRIED TO A JURY

NOTICE OF TRIAL

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE & MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC696911 WITH CASE NO. BC614625, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT [PROPOSED] CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AND SERVED CONCURRENTLY

6/1/2018: NOTICE & MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC696911 WITH CASE NO. BC614625, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT [PROPOSED] CROSS COMPLAINT FILED AND SERVED CONCURRENTLY

APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE; ETC.

7/6/2018: APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE; ETC.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

7/13/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE AND ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/16/2018: NOTICE AND ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

OPPOSITION TO BENJAMIN STORCK?SEXPARTE I APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR! SUMMARY JTDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 437C(B)

8/30/2018: OPPOSITION TO BENJAMIN STORCK?SEXPARTE I APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR! SUMMARY JTDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 437C(B)

DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE; ETC.

9/19/2018: DECLARATION OF JOHNNY WHITE; ETC.

DEFENDANT STORCK'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/21/2018: DEFENDANT STORCK'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN STORCK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STORCK'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR; ETC.

9/28/2018: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN STORCK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STORCK'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR; ETC.

Minute Order

10/5/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/5/2018: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

11/30/2018: Opposition

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

4/22/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

7/27/2016: Minute Order

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Reply (Consolidated Reply to Benjamin Storck's Oppositions to Demurrer and Motion to Strike); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Opposition (to motion to strike); Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Opposition (to demurrer to first amended complaint); Filed by Benjamin Storck (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((1-2 Days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Benjamin Storck (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Modern Auctions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC614625    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 51

The court is inclined to rule on Plaintiff's motions in limine as follows: 1. Exclude evidence disputing authenticity of items- GRANT2. Exclude evidence contradicting Defendant's judicial admissions- DEFER3. Exclude evidence re: Plaintiff's trade secrets- GRANT4. Exclude evidence not disclosed in discovery- GRANT