This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2020 at 11:56:27 (UTC).

MJJ PRODUCTIONS INC VS JULIENS AUCTION HOUSE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/04/2009 MJJ PRODUCTIONS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JULIENS AUCTION HOUSE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERNEST HIROSHIGE and VICTOR GREENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8913

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

VICTOR GREENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MJJ PRODUCTIONS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

JULIEN DARREN

JULIEN'S AUCTION HOUSE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUTMAN ALAN S. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HAWXHURST GERALD E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (w/prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding; MOTION/APPL-PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (defs. supplemental request for judicial notice ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • DocketObjection Document; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department 66, Victor Greenberg, Presiding; Hrng Appl for Writ of Possess - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (OF KATHLEEN GUZMAN ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketAppl for Writ of Possession (C&D); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketNotice ( OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF ALAN S. GUTMAN RE NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WOP AND TRO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATED TRO ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TOMHME R. TOHME, WELL AND MARCUS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • DocketPoints and Authorities ( IN SUPPORT OF APPLIC FOR WOP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juliens Auctions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MJJ PRODUCTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWXHURST GERALD EDWARD