This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 21:20:55 (UTC).

MITRA KOHANOF VS 26 MOORPARK LLC ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/23/2009 MITRA KOHANOF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 26 MOORPARK LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK J. JOHNSON, MARIA E. STRATTON, JAMES A. KADDO and JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5957

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FRANK J. JOHNSON

MARIA E. STRATTON

JAMES A. KADDO

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOHANOF MITRA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SAMADI VAJIEH

HAGHNAZARZADEH DAVID

ORANGE COAST TITLE

PATEL SANJAY

ZADEH DAVID

SAMADI YADOLLA

ALL CENTURY INC.

26 MOORPARK LLC

SOUTHLAND TITLE CO.

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC.

DOES 1-100

TTE SAMADI FAMILY TRUST

VOSOGHI KOUROSH

BOODAIE JOSEPH

ONYX CAPITAL GROUP LLC

COMERICA BANK

Others

PATTON JOHN WESLEY II

SARA BOODAIE TRUSTEE OF THE YAHOUDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLEN JAMES GERALD

ABIRI & SZETO

Defendant Attorneys

SEPASSI STEVEN MIR

COHEN PETER

SHEPAPRD MULLIN ET AL

GROSSMAN BRIAN MATTHEW

SHEM-TOV SHALEM

WEISS JONATHAN

KALUGER MICHAEL MELVIN JR

SHABANI KAMBIZ JOSEPH

SHEPPARD MULLIN ET AL

HILL FARRER & BURRILL

MINOOFAR PEDRAM .

SPELLERBERG JEFFERY KENT

SABRINA BELDNER

GLUCKSMAN JACOB

KHODZHAYAN VAKHE

WEISS WALTER

Other Attorney

WEISS RICHARD HOWARD

Other Attorneys

AVER RAYMOND HILLEL

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

5/19/2016: NOTICE OF DEFAULT (UNLIMITED CIVIL APPEALS)

REMITTITUR

9/11/2017: REMITTITUR

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • at 10:00 am in Department NWT, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Motion-Compel (.JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION**ADDRESS TRUST FUNDS, SEE TEXT**) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION BY JUDGMENT DEBTOR; ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Motion to Compel (PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION BY JUDGMENT DEBTOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SHALEM SHEM-TOV, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:31 am in Department NWT, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Motion (DURATION OF ORAP LIEN) - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Order (EXTENDING DURATION OF ORAP LIEN ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Opposition (TO JUDGMENT CREDITORS' MOTION TO EXTEND DURATION OF ORAP LIEN ); Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Motion (TO EXTEND DURATION OF ORAP LIEN; DECLARATION OF SHALEM SHEM-TOV IN SUPPORT THEREOF ); Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • at 10:00 am in Department NWT, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Examination-Judgment Debtor (AS TO JOSEPH BOODAIE) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • at 10:00 am in Department NWT, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Examination-Judgment Debtor (AS TO JOSEPH BOODAIE) - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • at 10:00 am in Department NWT, John J. Kralik, Presiding; Examination-Judgment Debtor - Not held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
388 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • Declaration-Diligence; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Notice-Bankruptcy; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • Declaration-Diligence; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC085957    Hearing Date: November 24, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING: GRANT.  EVIDENCE WHICH WAS COURT ORDERED TO BE PRODUCED AND WHICH WAS NOT PRODUCED WILL BE EXCLUDED AT THE TIME OF THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING.  SPECIFIC ORDERS ARE TO BE IDENTIFIED.

JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE

KOHANOF V 26 MOORPARK