This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 11:39:30 (UTC).

MITCH HART ET AL VS AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2008 MITCH HART filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN A. KRONSTADT, MARY ANN MURPHY and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4720

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN A. KRONSTADT

MARY ANN MURPHY

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ENTEMAN DAVID

HART MITCH

RISCHAR MARY

Defendants and Respondents

ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

AMERON

AMERON INC.

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CSR LTD.

DOES 1-820

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GARLOCK INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

JOHN K. BICE CO. INC.

KEENAN PIPE & SUPPLY

KEENAN PROPERTIES INC.

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HANLEY DEAN A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GREENBERG MITCHELL B. ESQ.

FOX ADAM R. ESQ.

SHELDON CHARLES T. ESQ.

MCCALL MICHAEL T. ESQ.

KANNETT MARK S. ESQ.

FOLEY STEPHEN J. ESQ.

GLASPY DAVID M. ESQ.

SAYERS WILLIAM J. ESQ.

HAMBLETT ROBERT M. ESQ.

POND FRANK D. ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BLACKARD EUGENE C. JR. ESQ.

13 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Docketin Department 30, John A. Kronstadt, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice; Complaint; Entire action of all parties & all causes of action; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • Docketin Department 30, John A. Kronstadt, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Complaint; As to the defendant Yamaha Corp of America, only. each party to bear its own costs; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (Complaint; As to the dfendant Yamaha Motor Corp, USA, only. Each party to bear its own costs; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Docketin Department 30, John A. Kronstadt, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Docketat 04:15 pm in Department 1, ELIHU M. BERLE, Presiding; Order Re: Reassignment of Case - Transferred to different departmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Docketin Department 25, Mary Ann Murphy, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Court Disqualifies Self

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2001
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARLOCK INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CSR LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant