This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 08:33:55 (UTC).

MINH BUI VS. A2Z CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/05/2015 MINH BUI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A2Z CONSTRUCTION DESIGN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4305

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUI MINH

Defendants

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORP.

LE HOA VAN AN INDIVIDUAL

TILE OUTLET & STONE AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

LE KHOA AN INDIVIDUAL

A2Z CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN INC.

TILE OUTLET & STONE

LE HOA

LE KHOA

KHOA LE CONSTRUCTION DOE 1

KHOA LE CONSTRUCTION INC. DOE 3

VECTOR DESIGN AND BUILD DOE 4

VECTOR DESIGN & BUILD INC. DOE 5

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY DOE 2

Cross Defendant

TRAN THALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS F. NOWLAND

Defendant Attorneys

GASCOU HOPKINS LLP

PITRE RANDALL J.

STEPHEN A. COLBY ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Khoa, Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2015
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • General Denial; Filed by Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Khoa, Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Khoa, Le (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Minh Bui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less