This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 01:08:56 (UTC).

MILLARD, HOLWEGER, CHILD & MARTON VS. BRUCE H. MCKINNON

Case Summary

On 04/22/2010 MILLARD, HOLWEGER, CHILD MARTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRUCE H MCKINNON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY ANN MURPHY, DAVID L. MINNING and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6304

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY ANN MURPHY

DAVID L. MINNING

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

MCKINNON BRUCE H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SICILIANO NICHOLAS A. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2011
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Further Status Conference (Further Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Millard, Holweger, Child & Marton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Millard, Holweger, Child & Marton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Millard, Holweger, Child & Marton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 25; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Millard, Holweger, Child & Marton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2010
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Millard, Holweger, Child & Marton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLARD HOLWEGER CHILD & MARTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SICILIANO NICHOLAS ARTHUR