This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 00:18:41 (UTC).

MILDRED L HART VS WARNER BROS ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2014 MILDRED L HART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WARNER BROS ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9910

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HART MILDRED L.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

WARNER BROS STUDIO FACILITIES

WARNER BROS. ENTERPRISES LLC

WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.

WARNER BROS. LLC

WARNER BROS STUDIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF COHEN & MARZBAN LAW CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SMITH KEVIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1] GENERAL NEGLIGENCE 2] PREMISES LIABILITY

10/7/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1] GENERAL NEGLIGENCE 2] PREMISES LIABILITY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/7/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/12/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/12/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MILDRED L HART'S COMPLAINT

11/26/2014: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MILDRED L HART'S COMPLAINT

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE [PROPOSED] ORDE

4/3/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR A MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE [PROPOSED] ORDE

NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION TO AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

4/10/2015: NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION TO AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF JAY L. JORDAN, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

4/10/2015: DECLARATION OF JAY L. JORDAN, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION FOR AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

4/17/2015: Minute Order

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.; WARNER BROS. LLC; WARNER BROS. ENTERPRISES LLC; WARNER BROS STUDIO; ORDER

4/24/2015: STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC.; WARNER BROS. LLC; WARNER BROS. ENTERPRISES LLC; WARNER BROS STUDIO; ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION TO AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

4/24/2015: NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SPECIALLY SET ACTION TO AN EARLY TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

4/27/2015: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN1 TO BE HEARD WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF TRIAL AND FOR AN ORDEF SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR

4/27/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN1 TO BE HEARD WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF TRIAL AND FOR AN ORDEF SPECIALLY SETTING THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR

DEFENDANT WARNER BROS. STUDIO FACILITIES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF PIPER A. WALDRON; DECLARATION OF JACK SARACENO; ETC.

5/12/2015: DEFENDANT WARNER BROS. STUDIO FACILITIES' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF PIPER A. WALDRON; DECLARATION OF JACK SARACENO; ETC.

DEFENDANT WARNER BROS. STUDIO FACILITIES? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

5/12/2015: DEFENDANT WARNER BROS. STUDIO FACILITIES? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/30/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7/9/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/9/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE___________________ ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Statement of Facts Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application ((FILED BY WARNER BROS DEFTS) TO ALLOW M.S.J. W/IN 30 DAYS OF (CCP 36) TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (STIP/ORDER RE DISM OF WARNER BROS DEFTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Declaration ( DR DECLARATION RE PLFF'S HEALTH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE (CCP 36) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Opposition Document ((FILED BY WARNER DEFTS) TO PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARNER BROS. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner Bros. Enterprises, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH KEVIN D