This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2016 at 18:01:34 (UTC).

MILAGRO RAMOS VS. CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2011 MILAGRO RAMOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHEVRON U S A , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, BOBBI TILLMON, H. CHESTER HORN, JR., JACQUELINE A. CONNOR, CRAIG D. KARLAN, LISA HART COLE, JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN, LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1863

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

BOBBI TILLMON

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

JACQUELINE A. CONNOR

CRAIG D. KARLAN

LISA HART COLE

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS MILAGRO

Defendants

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.#1428

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

Other

GIRARDI AND KEESE

Intervenor

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWELL JONATHAN E.

POCRASS JAMES L.

Defendant Attorneys

SEDGWICK LLP

BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

COSGROVE PHILIP R.

Intervenor Attorney

LAUGHLIN FALBO LEVY & MORESI

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER

5/23/2013: MINUTE ORDER

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAID TO JEFFREY N LUB A US; ETC

6/12/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAID TO JEFFREY N LUB A US; ETC

DEFENDANT CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ABSENCE OF PRIOR ACCIDENTS;

6/18/2013: DEFENDANT CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF ABSENCE OF PRIOR ACCIDENTS;

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAIL) TO JEFFREY NEIJHAUS

6/24/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAIL) TO JEFFREY NEIJHAUS

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS; MEMORANI)L)M OF POINTS AM) AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RYAN E. COSGROVE; (PROPOSEDI OR

6/24/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS; MEMORANI)L)M OF POINTS AM) AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RYAN E. COSGROVE; (PROPOSEDI OR

JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

6/25/2013: JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS

JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

6/25/2013: JOINT EXHIBIT LIST

JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

6/25/2013: JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

JOINT WITNESS LIST

6/25/2013: JOINT WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT CHEVRON STATIONS, INC.?S TRIAL BRIEF

6/25/2013: DEFENDANT CHEVRON STATIONS, INC.?S TRIAL BRIEF

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAID TO JEFFREY NEUHAUS;

6/27/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AND/OR EVIDENCE RE WITNESS FEES PAID TO JEFFREY NEUHAUS;

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO CHEVRON STATION, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETA AS A WITNESS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JONAT

6/28/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO CHEVRON STATION, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETA AS A WITNESS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JONAT

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF WRITTEN STATEMENT OF JEFFREY NEUHAUS AND EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY PAST CONDUCT AND/OR ACTS O

7/1/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF WRITTEN STATEMENT OF JEFFREY NEUHAUS AND EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY PAST CONDUCT AND/OR ACTS O

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES

7/1/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES

MINUTE ORDER

7/2/2013: MINUTE ORDER

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS

7/8/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS

CHEVRON STATIONS INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS

7/8/2013: CHEVRON STATIONS INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/17/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Complaint in Intervention of Fireman's Fund Insurance Co.; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Reply/Response (TO PLTFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8 TO PRECLUDE PLTFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETTA AS A WITNESS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Reply (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF WRITTEN STATEMENT OF JEFFREY NEUHAUS AND EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY PAST CONDUCT AND/OR ACTS OF J. NEUHAUS) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Opposition (TO CHEVRON STATION, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 8 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM CALLING ROBERT ARCHULETA AS A WITNESS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Opposition ( to Deft's MIL #1 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Reply/Response ( to Plf's Oppo to MIL #7 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • List of Witnesses (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • Statement of Case (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (COURT DARK 7/5/11 CONT TO 7/19/11 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • Amendment to Complaint (TN: CHEVRON STATIONS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Amendment to Complaint (AND ORDER RECEIVED ONLY 4/8/11 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • Amendment to Complaint (FICTIOUS NAME CHEVRON STATIONS, INC. #1428 TRUE NAME CHEVRON STATIONS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GIRARDI & KEESE is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant