This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 01:05:47 (UTC).

MID CITIES CREDIT UNION VS. IVORY LEE TACKWOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 MID CITIES CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IVORY LEE TACKWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8603

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID CITIES CREDIT UNION

Defendants

TACKWOOD IVORY L.

TACKWOOD IVORY LEE

FORD IVORY TACKWOOD

TACKWOOD IVORY

EXETER FINANCE CORP.

DOES1-200

TACKWOOD FORD IVORY

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON A. LYSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO DEFT. EXETER FINANCE CORP. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Court Order - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFT, IVORY LEE TACKWOOD AKA IVORY L. TACKWOOD AKA IVORY TACKWOOD AKA FORD IVORY TACKWOOD AND DOE DEFENDANTS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (2) OSC RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by MID CITIES CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less